blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2454275

EP2454275 - PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR OBTAINING BOTULINUM NEUROTOXIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 12.08.2020  [2020/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
[2017/28]
Former [2012/21]For all designated states
Allergan, Inc.
2525 Dupont Drive, T2-7H
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TON, Jennifer L.
3595 Sego Street
Irvine California 92606 / US
02 / PATEL, Hemant A.
12 Twilight Lane
Rancho Santa Margarita California 92688 / US
03 / BATES, Ronald C.
457 Shadow Oaks
Irvine California 92618 / US
04 / AHMAD, Wajdie M.
2103 Anacapa
Irvine California 92602 / US
 [2012/21]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2017/28]
Former [2012/21]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10733117.512.07.2010
[2017/28]
WO2010US41745
Priority number, dateUS2009050218113.07.2009         Original published format: US 502181
[2012/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2011008713
Date:20.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2454275
Date:23.05.2012
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2012/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2454275
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.01.2011
ClassificationIPC:C07K14/33, C12N1/20, C12P21/02, A61K38/16
[2012/21]
CPC:
C12N9/52 (EP,US); C07K14/33 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K38/16 (KR);
B01D15/361 (EP,US); B01D15/362 (EP,US); B01D15/363 (EP,US);
C07K1/00 (KR); C07K1/18 (KR,US); C12N1/20 (KR,US);
C12P21/02 (CN,US); C12R2001/145 (US); C12Y304/24069 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BOTULINUM NEUROTOXIN[2016/34]
English:PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR OBTAINING BOTULINUM NEUROTOXIN[2012/21]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR OBTENIR LA NEUROTOXINE BOTULIQUE[2016/34]
Former [2012/21]VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR GEWINNUNG VON BOTULINUMNEUROTXIN
Former [2012/21]PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D OBTENTION DE LA TOXINE BOTULINIQUE
Entry into regional phase31.01.2012National basic fee paid 
31.01.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/21]
28.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2017Fee for grant paid
26.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17180720.9  / EP3252070
EP19200775.5  / EP3640259
EP22168797.3   Application refused  : 23.09.2022
EP22185200.7  / EP4141024
EP23194794.6
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2013
Opposition(s)13.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MK12.07.2017
MT12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
[2020/33]
Former [2019/51]HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MK12.07.2017
MT12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
Former [2018/43]HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MT12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
Former [2018/27]HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
Former [2018/15]HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
Former [2018/11]HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
Former [2018/07]LT12.07.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2006096164  (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al);
 [XDI]US2006228780  (LUO MINGJIANG [US], et al);
by applicantUS5512547
 US5696077
 US5756468
 US6087327
 US2003008367
 US6558926
 US2003118598
 US2006228780
 US7148041
 US7160699
 US7189541
 US7354740
 US7445914
 US7452697
 US20060452570
 US20060609449
 US20070932689
 US20070932789
 US20080098899
 US20080234537
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.