EP2452277 - METHODS, SYSTEMS AND DEVICES FOR PERFORMING INCREMENTAL UPDATES OF PARTIAL DATABASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norsync Technology AS General Birchs gate 16 0454 Oslo / NO | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SJØGREN, Bjørn-Harald Bekkestien 26B N-1406 Ski / NO | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Ekeberg, Tom Steinar, et al Zacco Norway AS Haakon VII's gt. 2 0125 Oslo / NO | [2012/20] | Application number, filing date | 10736851.6 | 02.07.2010 | [2018/34] | WO2010NO00260 | Priority number, date | US20090500370 | 09.07.2009 Original published format: US 500370 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011005106 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2452277 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2452277 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,KR,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F16/24564 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | BA | 08.02.2012 | ME | 08.02.2012 | RS | 08.02.2012 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR SCHRITTWEISE AKTUALISIERUNGEN PARTIELLER DATENBANKEN | [2012/20] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS AND DEVICES FOR PERFORMING INCREMENTAL UPDATES OF PARTIAL DATABASES | [2012/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET DISPOSITIFS D' EXÉCUTION DE MISES À JOUR INCRÉMENTALES DE BASES DE DONNÉES PARTIELLES | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 24.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.01.2018 | 10.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.2012 | 31.07.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | MT | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | PT | 22.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
MT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]US5758337 (HAMMOND BRADLEY MARK [US]) [I] 1-36 * column 2, lines 18-58 * * column 3, lines 5-35 * * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 26 * * column 9, lines 18-54 *; | [A]US5758355 (BUCHANAN DAVID D [US]) [A] 1-36 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 52 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 30 ** column 6, lines 8-63 *; | [XI]WO9838586 (SIEBEL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,13,25 * page 3, lines 15-28 * * page 7, line 29 - page 9, line 17 * * page 12, lines 17-26 * * page 13, lines 9-14 * * page 16, line 9 - page 19, line 26 * * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 3 * [I] 2-12,14-24,26-36 |