blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2496580

EP2496580 - BENZODIAZEPINE BROMODOMAIN INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2014
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: RO
published on 27.05.2015  [2015/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Corporation Service Company
2711 Centreville Road
Suite 400
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/03]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Corporation Service Company
2711 Centreville Road
Suite 400
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
Former [2012/37]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOSMINI, Romain Luc Marie
c/o Laboratoire GlaxoSmithKline
Centre de Recherches
Z.A. de Courtboeuf
25 Avenue du Quebec
F-91940 Les Ulis / FR
02 / MIRGUET, Olivier
Laboratoire GlaxoSmithKline
Centre de Recherches
Z.A. de Courtaboeuf
25 Avenue du Quebec
F-91940 Les Ulis / FR
 [2012/37]
Representative(s)Shore, Andrew David
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]Shore, Andrew David
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN 925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date10740654.806.08.2010
WO2010EP61518
Priority number, dateGB2009001943305.11.2009         Original published format: GB 0919433
GB2010001050922.06.2010         Original published format: GB 201010509
[2012/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2011054553
Date:12.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2496580
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2012/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2496580
Date:11.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.05.2011
ClassificationIPC:C07D487/04, A61K31/55, A61P35/00, A61P43/00
[2012/37]
CPC:
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/551 (EP,US); A61K31/5517 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (US); A61P29/00 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP); A61P37/02 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/37]
Extension statesBA27.04.2012
ME27.04.2012
RS27.04.2012
TitleGerman:BENZODIAZEPIN-BROMDÖMÄNENHEMMER[2012/37]
English:BENZODIAZEPINE BROMODOMAIN INHIBITOR[2012/37]
French:INHIBITEUR DE BROMODOMAINE DE BENZODIAZÉPINE[2012/37]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2012National basic fee paid 
27.04.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/37]
24.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2013Fee for grant paid
28.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13192666.9  / EP2722334
EP16150637.3  / EP3037423
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2013
Opposition(s)12.09.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/22]
Former [2014/37]RO11.12.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5116971  (HARREUS ALBRECHT [DE], et al);
 [X]EP0934940  (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]);
 [YD]WO2009084693  (MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORP [JP], et al)
by applicantGB2242134
 WO2005044354
 JP2008156311
 WO2009084693
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.