EP2396652 - DIAGNOSIS OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL SYNDROME BASED ON CYTOLETHAL DISTENDING TOXIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/51] | ANTIBODY TO CYTOLETHAL DISTENDING TOXIN OF CAMPYLOBACTER JEJUNI | ||
[2017/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cedars-Sinai Medical Center 8700 Beverly Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | [2017/50] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Cedars-Sinai Medical Center 8700 Beverly Boulevard Los Angeles, California 90048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIMENTEL, Mark 9805 Burgen Ave. Los Angeles California 90034 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Christopher 3271 S. Sepulveda Blvd., 202 Los Angeles California 90034 / US | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/50] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2014/07] | Holmes, Michael Anthony, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2011/51] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 10741728.9 | 11.02.2010 | [2017/50] | WO2010US23911 | Priority number, date | US20090151779P | 11.02.2009 Original published format: US 151779 P | US20090286250P | 14.12.2009 Original published format: US 286250 P | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010093801 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2396652 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2396652 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/573 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
A61K39/105 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (US);
A61K39/02 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K16/12 (EP,US);
C07K16/121 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
A61K2039/522 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
G01N2333/24 (EP,US);
G01N2333/25 (EP,US);
G01N2333/922 (US);
G01N2800/065 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/51] | G01N33/48, C07K16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSE CHRONISCH ENTZÜNDLICHER DARMERKRANKUNGEN MITTELS CYTOLETHAL DISTENDING TOXIN | [2017/25] | English: | DIAGNOSIS OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL SYNDROME BASED ON CYTOLETHAL DISTENDING TOXIN | [2017/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC DES MALADIES INFLAMMATOIRES CHRONIQUES DE L'INTESTIN UTILISANT LA TOXINE CYTOLÉTHALE DISTENDANTE | [2017/25] |
Former [2011/51] | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN CYTOLETHAL DISTENDING TOXIN VON CAMPYLOBACTER JEJUNI | ||
Former [2011/51] | ANTIBODY TO CYTOLETHAL DISTENDING TOXIN OF CAMPYLOBACTER JEJUNI | ||
Former [2011/51] | ANTICORPS DIRIGÉ CONTRE LA TOXINE CYTOLÉTHALE DISTENDANTE DE CAMPYLOBACTER JEJUNI | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 11.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17206465.1 / EP3349004 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2010 | AT | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | LU | 11.02.2018 | MT | 11.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | BG | 13.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 11.02.2010 | |
AT | 13.12.2017 | ||
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2018 | ||
MT | 11.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2018 | ||
MT | 11.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2018 | ||
MT | 11.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2018 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | HR | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | HR | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | HR | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006127359 (BORRELLI MICHAEL J [US]); | [X]US2007212691 (YAMASAKI SHINJI [JP], et al); | by applicant | US4816567 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5585089 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5661016 | US6719971 |