blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2440177

EP2440177 - PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORM FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF A BCL-2 FAMILY INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2016
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abbott GmbH & Co. KG
Max-Planck-Ring 2
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
[2012/16]
Inventor(s)01 / PACKHAEUSER, Claudia
Burgstrasse 7
68165 Mannheim / DE
02 / STEIGER, Norbert
Druslacherstrasse 1
67360 Lingenfeld / DE
03 / LIEPOLD, Bernd
Birkenweg 44
69221 Dossenheim / DE
04 / KOSTELAC, Drazen
R4
15
68161 Mannheim / DE
05 / KNOBLOCH, Martin
Medenheimer Strasse 22a
67141 Neuhofen / DE
 [2012/16]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al
Modiano & Partners (DE)
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2012/16]
Application number, filing date10742875.708.06.2010
[2015/38]
WO2010IB01659
Priority number, dateUS20090185130P08.06.2009         Original published format: US 185130 P
[2012/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2010143074
Date:16.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2440177
Date:18.04.2012
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2012/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2440177
Date:16.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.02.2011
Supplementary international search report - requested on:RU05.01.2011
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/00, A61K31/5377, A61K9/14
[2012/16]
CPC:
A61K31/635 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K9/00 (RU); A61K9/146 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/0053 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K31/5377 (KR,RU); A61K9/14 (RU);
A61K9/20 (KR); A61K9/2013 (US); A61K9/2027 (US);
A61K9/2095 (US); A61K9/4833 (KR,US); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP); A61K2121/00 (KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/16]
Extension statesBA29.12.2011
ME29.12.2011
RS29.12.2011
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE DOSIERUNGSFORM ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG EINES HEMMERS DER BCL-2-FAMILIE[2012/16]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORM FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF A BCL-2 FAMILY INHIBITOR[2012/16]
French:FORME POSOLOGIQUE PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION ORALE D'UN INHIBITEUR DE LA FAMILLE DE BCL-2[2012/16]
Entry into regional phase29.12.2011National basic fee paid 
29.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
29.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/16]
16.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2015Fee for grant paid
05.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15184904.9  / EP2982366
EP17181461.9  / EP3272334
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.04.2015
Opposition(s)17.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/30]MK16.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[Y]RU2159107  (NOVARTIS AG [CH]);
 [Y]RU2318518  ;
International search[AD]US2007027135  (BRUNCKO MILAN [US], et al);
 [AP]WO2009073835  (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al);
by applicantWO0057854
 WO0100175
 US2005208082
 US2005236236
 US2007027135
 WO2007040650
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.