blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2504362

EP2504362 - ANTI-C5A BINDING MOIETIES WITH HIGH BLOCKING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.11.2017  [2017/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InflaRx GmbH
Winzerlaer Strasse 2
07745 Jena / DE
[2012/40]
Inventor(s)01 / GUO, Renfeng
5816 Villa France Ave
Ann Arbor MI 48103 / US
02 / RIEDEMANN, Niels, Christoph
Fröbelstieg 8
07743 Jena / DE
03 / LI, Yan
Beijing Mabworks Biotech Co. Ltd.
Building No.3
Huilongsen Science Park
14 Kechuang Street, 1 Jinghai Road, Ciqu Town, Tongzhou District
Beijing / CN
04 / SHEN, Beifen
Beijing Mabworks Biotech Co. Ltd.
Building No.3
Huilongsen Science Park
14 Kechuang Street, 1 Jinghai Road, Ciqu Town, Tongzhou District
Beijing / CN
 [2012/40]
Representative(s)Zwicker, Jörk, et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/47]Zwicker, Jörk, et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
Former [2012/40]Zwicker, Jörk, et al
Dr. Volker Vossius
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date10782561.426.11.2010
[2016/47]
WO2010EP07197
Priority number, dateEP2009001474526.11.2009         Original published format: EP 09014745
US20090264696P26.11.2009         Original published format: US 264696 P
[2012/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2011063980
Date:03.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2504362
Date:03.10.2012
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2012/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2504362
Date:23.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.2011
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/18
[2012/40]
CPC:
C07K16/18 (EP,KR,US); A61K38/17 (KR); A61K38/18 (KR);
A61K39/395 (EP,KR,US); A61K48/00 (KR); A61K49/16 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP); A61P1/04 (EP); A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP); A61P13/12 (EP); A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP); A61P19/02 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP); A61P31/04 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP); A61P37/06 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP); C07K14/00 (US); C07K14/435 (KR);
C07K14/47 (US); C07K14/475 (KR); C07K16/22 (KR);
C07K16/28 (KR); C07K19/00 (KR); A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US); C07K2317/565 (EP,US); C07K2317/567 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US); C07K2317/92 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTI-C5A-BINDENDE TEILE MIT HOHER BLOCKIERAKTIVITÄT[2012/40]
English:ANTI-C5A BINDING MOIETIES WITH HIGH BLOCKING ACTIVITY[2012/40]
French:GROUPES CARACTÉRISTIQUES À LIAISON ANTI-C5A AVEC UNE ACTIVITÉ À BLOCAGE ÉLEVÉ[2016/35]
Former [2012/40]FRACTIONS DE LIAISON ANTI-C5A À ACTIVITÉ BLOQUANTE ÉLEVÉE
Entry into regional phase21.06.2012National basic fee paid 
21.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/40]
17.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
21.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2016Fee for grant paid
12.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16199344.9  / EP3181582
EP20153768.5
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2013
Opposition(s)24.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO0115731  (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al);
 [Y]EP1878441  (TANOX INC [US]);
by applicantUS4704355
 WO9104014
 US5624821
 US5648260
 US5939598
 US6121022
 US6194551
 WO0115731
 US6277375
 WO03015819
 US2003118592
 US2003133939
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.