blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2361090

EP2361090 - COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CENTRALLY MEDIATED NAUSEA AND VOMITING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.03.2015
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Helsinn Healthcare SA
Via Pian Scairolo 9
6912 Lugano-Pazzallo / CH
[2012/26]
Former [2011/35]For all designated states
Helsinn Healthcare S.A.
Via Pian Scairolo, 9
6912 Lugano / CH
Inventor(s)01 / TRENTO, Fabio
Via Alla Valle, 20 B
I-22020 Parè (Como) / IT
02 / CANTOREGGI, Sergio
Via ai Ronchi 37
CH-6943 Vezia / CH
03 / ROSSI, Giorgia
Via della Libertà, 1A
I-22012 Cernobbio (Como) / IT
04 / CANNELLA, Roberta
Via Al Colle, 42
I-21100 Varese / IT
05 / BONADEO, Daniele
Via Ronco Capo Caccia, 32
I-21030 Casalzuigno (Varese) / IT
06 / BRAGLIA, Riccardo
Via Pian Scairolo 9
6912 Lugano-Pazzallo / CH
 [2012/27]
Former [2012/25]01 / TRENTO, Fabio
Via Alla Valle, 20 B
I-22020 Parè (Como) / IT
02 / CANTOREGGI, Sergio
Via ai Ronchi 37
CH-6943 Vezia / CH
03 / ROSSI, Giorgia
Via della Libertà, 1A
I-22012 Cernobbio (Como) / IT
04 / CANNELLA, Roberta
Via Al Colle, 42
I-21100 (Varese) / IT
05 / BONADEO, Daniele
Via Ronco Capo Caccia, 32
I-21030 Casalzuigno (Varese) / IT
06 / BRAGLIA, Riccardo
Via Pian Scairolo 9
6912 Lugano-Pazzallo / CH
Former [2012/21]01 / TRENTO, Fabio
Via Alla Valle 20 B
I-22020 Parè (Como) / IT
02 / CANTOREGGI, Sergio
Via ai Ronchi 37
CH-6943 Vezia / CH
03 / ROSSI, Giorgia
Via della Libertà 1A
I-22012 Cernobbio (Como) / IT
04 / CANNELLA, Roberta
Via Al Colle 42
I-21100 Varese / IT
05 / BONADEO, Daniele
Via Ronco Capo Caccia 32
I-21030 Casalzuigno (Varese) / IT
06 / BRAGLIA, Riccardo
Via Pian Scairolo 9
CH-6912 Lugano-Pazzallo / CH
Former [2011/35]01 / TRENTO, Fabio
Via Alla Valle 20 B
I-22020 Pare Como / IT
02 / CANTOREGGI, Sergio
Via ai Ronchi 37
CH-6943 Vezia / CH
03 / ROSSI, Giorgia
Via della Liberta 1A
I-22012 Cernobbio Como / IT
04 / CANNELA, Roberta
Via Al Colle 42
I-21100 Varese / IT
05 / BONADEO, Daniele
Via Ronco Capo Caccia 32
I-21030 Casalzuigno Varese / IT
06 / BRAGLIA, Riccardo
Via Pian Scairolo 9
CH-6912 Lugano-Pazzalo / CH
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2014/21]
Former [2011/35]Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Application number, filing date10805301.818.11.2010
WO2010IB03106
Priority number, dateUS20100382709P14.09.2010         Original published format: US 382709 P
US20090262470P18.11.2009         Original published format: US 262470 P
[2011/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2011061622
Date:26.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2361090
Date:31.08.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2361090
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2011
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/4178, A61K31/473, A61K31/496, A61K31/573, A61K45/06, A61K9/20, A61K9/48, A61P1/08
[2013/41]
CPC:
A61K31/496 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K31/4178 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K45/06 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/473 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K31/573 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K9/0053 (CN,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,CN,US); A61K9/4808 (EP,CN,US); A61K9/4858 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/4866 (CN); A61P1/00 (EP); A61P1/08 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP); A61P5/44 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/4178, A61K2300/00 (CN,US,EP);
A61K31/473, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/573, A61K31/496, A61K31/473 (CN)
(-)
Former IPC [2011/35]A61K31/4178, A61K31/473, A61K31/496, A61K31/573, A61K45/06, A61P1/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/21]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZENTRAL VERMITTELTEM UNWOHLSEIN UND ERBRECHEN[2011/35]
English:COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CENTRALLY MEDIATED NAUSEA AND VOMITING[2011/35]
French:COMPOSITIONS POUR TRAITER LES NAUSÉES ET VOMISSEMENTS À MÉDIATION CENTRALE[2011/35]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2011National basic fee paid 
22.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/35]
18.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.01.2014Fee for grant paid
21.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14151676.5  / EP2727590
EP14151678.1  / EP2722044
EP14151683.1  / EP2722045
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2012
Opposition(s)24.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2016/32]
Former [2015/08]BE21.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2008049552  (HELSINN HEALTHCARE SA [CH], et al);
ExaminationWO2007096763
by applicantUS5202333
 US5510486
 US6297375
 US6593472
 US6719996
 WO2004045615
 US6747026
 WO2004067005
 WO2004073714
 US6806370
 WO2008049552
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.