blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2470199

EP2470199 - DOSE ESCALATION ENZYME REPLACEMENT THERAPY FOR TREATING ACID SPHINGOMYELINASE DEFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.03.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 03.08.2022  [2022/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai
One Gustave L. Levy Place
New York, NY 10029 / US
For all designated states
Genzyme Corporation
50 Binney Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2018/39]
Former [2018/29]For all designated states
Mount Sinai School of Medicine
One Gustave Levy Place
New York, NY 10029-6547 / US
For all designated states
Genzyme Corporation
50 Binney Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
Former [2018/19]For all designated states
Mount Sinai School of Medicine
One Gustave Levy Place
New York, NY 10029-6547 / US
For all designated states
Genzyme Corporation
500 Kendall Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
Former [2012/27]For all designated states
Mount Sinai School of Medicine
One Gustave L. Levy Place
New York, NY 10029-6547 / US
For all designated states
Genzyme Corporation
500 Kendall Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCHUCHMAN, Edward, H.
300 Lakeshore Drive
Haworth NJ 07641 / US
02 / DESNICK, Robert, J.
170 East 93rd Street
New York NY 10128 / US
03 / COX, Gerald, F.
48 Avon Circle
Needham MA 02494 / US
04 / ANDREWS, Laura, P.
32 Farm Road
Bolton MA 01740 / US
05 / MURRAY, James, M.
42 Wachusett Circle
Shrewsbury MA 01545 / US
 [2012/27]
Representative(s)Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/27]Weber, Martin, et al
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date10812683.028.08.2010
[2019/21]
WO2010US47057
Priority number, dateUS20090238113P28.08.2009         Original published format: US 238113 P
[2012/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2011025996
Date:03.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2470199
Date:04.07.2012
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2012/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2470199
Date:22.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.03.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2013
ClassificationIPC:A61K38/43, A61P3/06
[2012/27]
CPC:
A61K38/465 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61K38/43 (RU); A61P1/16 (EP,IL);
A61P11/00 (EP,IL); A61P25/00 (EP,IL,KR); A61P25/28 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL); A61P3/06 (EP,IL,KR,RU); A61P43/00 (KR);
C12N9/16 (CN,KR); C12Y301/04012 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DOSISERHÖHUNGS- UND ENZYMERSATZTHERAPIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG MANGELNDER SAURER SPHINGOMYELINASE[2012/27]
English:DOSE ESCALATION ENZYME REPLACEMENT THERAPY FOR TREATING ACID SPHINGOMYELINASE DEFICIENCY[2012/27]
French:THÉRAPIE DE SUBSTITUTION ENZYMATIQUE À DOSES CROISSANTES PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UN DÉFICIT EN SPHINGOMYÉLINASE ACIDE[2012/27]
Entry into regional phase19.03.2012National basic fee paid 
19.03.2012Search fee paid 
19.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/27]
09.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.02.2019Fee for grant paid
19.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.04.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
09.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18199358.5  / EP3482767
EP21200695.1  / EP3998078
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.12.2014
Opposition(s)25.02.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL22.05.2019
MK22.05.2019
SM22.05.2019
IS22.09.2019
[2022/31]
Former [2021/31]AL22.05.2019
SM22.05.2019
IS22.09.2019
Former [2020/14]AL22.05.2019
SM22.05.2019
Former [2019/50]AL22.05.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2007084737  (GENZYME CORP [US], et al);
International search[Y]US2005048047  (KAKKIS EMIL D [US]);
 [Y]US2007280925  (MEEKER DAVID [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.