blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2571902

EP2571902 - NOVEL PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
Rue de l'Institut, 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[2019/28]
Former [2013/13]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
rue de l'Institut, 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Inventor(s)01 / CHARLES, Philippe
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
rue de l'Institut 89
B-1330 Rixensart / BE
02 / GELDHOF, Geoffroy
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
rue de l'Institut 89
B-1330 Rixensart / BE
03 / MANCUSO, Vincent
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
rue de l'Institut 89
B-1330 Rixensart / BE
 [2013/13]
Representative(s)Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William, et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2019/28]
Former [2013/13]Robertson, James Stuart, et al
GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents CN925.1 980 Great West Road
Brenford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date11721756.218.05.2011
[2019/28]
WO2011EP58016
Priority number, dateGB2010000840120.05.2010         Original published format: GB 201008401
[2013/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2011144645
Date:24.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2571902
Date:27.03.2013
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2013/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2571902
Date:10.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.11.2011
ClassificationIPC:C08B37/00, C12P19/04
[2013/13]
CPC:
C08B37/0003 (EP,US); C07H1/00 (US); C09K3/00 (US);
C12P19/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUES VERFAHREN[2013/13]
English:NOVEL PROCESS[2013/13]
French:NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ[2013/13]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2012National basic fee paid 
16.11.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/13]
12.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2019Fee for grant paid
27.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2017
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
07.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
MK10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
[2022/32]
Former [2021/12]AL10.07.2019
MC10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
Former [2020/28]AL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
SM10.07.2019
Former [2020/15]AL10.07.2019
RS10.07.2019
Former [2020/12]RS10.07.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2220211  (RIBI IMMUNOCHEM RESEARCH INC [US]) [X] 1-38 * page 2 * * page 12, line 18 - line 23; example - *;
 [X]WO0026384  (NEDERLANDEN STAAT [NL], et al) [X] 1-36 * page 5, line 15 - line 17 * * example - *;
 [XD]WO02078637  (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [XD] 1-38 * page 3, line 21 - line 31; claim - *;
 [X]US2003108573  (PROPPERT HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1-36 * example - *;
 [X]WO2007106073  (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US], et al) [X] 1-36 * page 41, line 26 - page 42, line 28 *;
 [X]  - NURMINEN M ET AL, "Methanol extracts LPS from deep rough bacteria", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (19960101), vol. 219, no. 2, doi:10.1006/BBRC.1996.0252, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 441 - 444, XP002371332 [X] 1-36 * Materials and Methods *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1996.0252
 [X]  - BLIGH E G ET AL, "A RAPID METHOD OF TOTAL LIPID EXTRACTION AND PURIFICATION", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY, NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL OF CANADA, OTTAWA, CA, (19590801), vol. 37, no. 8, ISSN 0576-5544, pages 911 - 917, XP000998224 [X] 1-15 * page 911 - page 913 *
ExaminationUS4076589
 WO8803797
    - FOLCH J ET AL, "A SIMPLE METHOD FOR THE ISOLATION AND PURIFICATION OF TOTAL LIPIDES FROM ANIMAL TISSUES", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (19570101), vol. 224, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 497 - 509, XP009011060
by applicantUS4912094
 WO02078637
    - GALANOS ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1969), vol. 9, page 245
    - LUDERITZ ET AL., ANN. N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1966), vol. 133, pages 349 - 374
    - KANIPES ET AL., INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2004), vol. 72, pages 2452 - 2455
    - KLENA ET AL., J. BACT., (2005), vol. 187, pages 1710 - 1715
    - QURESHI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, pages 11971 - 11976
    - WIESE ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 10311 - 10319
    - JOHNSON ET AL., REV. INFECT. DIS., (1987), vol. 9, pages S512 - S516
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.