blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2585469

EP2585469 - BENZODIOXOLE OR BENZODIOXEPINE HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/18]BENZODIOXOLE OR BENZODIOXEPINE HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS
[2015/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leo Pharma A/S
Industriparken 55
2750 Ballerup / DK
[2013/18]
Inventor(s)01 / NIELSEN, Simon Feldbæk
c/o Leo Pharma A/S
Industriparken 55
DK-2750 Ballerup / DK
 [2013/18]
Application number, filing date11729889.324.06.2011
[2016/21]
WO2011DK00069
Priority number, dateUS20100358209P24.06.2010         Original published format: US 358209 P
[2013/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2011160632
Date:29.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2585469
Date:01.05.2013
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2013/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2585469
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.12.2011
ClassificationIPC:C07D493/10, C07D495/10, A61K31/4433, A61K31/4436, A61K31/443, A61P11/00, A61P17/00, A61P9/00, A61P25/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00
[2013/18]
CPC:
C07D495/10 (EP,US); C07D493/10 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/4427 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/443 (EP,US); A61K31/4433 (EP,US); A61K31/4436 (EP,US);
A61K9/0053 (US); A61P1/04 (EP); A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP); A61P11/06 (EP); A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP); A61P17/02 (EP); A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP); A61P17/14 (EP); A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP); A61P25/24 (EP); A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP); A61P3/10 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP); A61P37/02 (EP); A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP); C07D405/06 (KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HETEROCYCLISCHE BENZODIOXOL- BZW. BENZODIOXEPINVERBINDUNGEN ALS PHOSOPHODIESTERASEHEMMER[2013/18]
English:BENZODIOXOLE OR BENZODIOXEPINE HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS[2015/48]
French:COMPOSÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES BENZODIOXOLE OU BENZODIOXÉPINE INHIBANT LA PHOSPHODIESTÉRASE[2013/18]
Former [2013/18]BENZODIOXOLE OR BENZODIOXEPINE HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS
Entry into regional phase24.01.2013National basic fee paid 
24.01.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/18]
04.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2016Fee for grant paid
06.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16020112.5  / EP3070091
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.10.2013
Opposition(s)28.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
10.07.2014Request for further processing filed
10.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.07.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
LU24.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]MC25.05.2016
MK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
LU24.06.2016
Former [2017/22]MC25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
Former [2017/13]SM25.05.2016
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2008104175  (LEO PHARMA AS [DK], et al) [ID] 1-21 * claims 1-17 * * page 1, lines 4-6; examples 1-31 *;
 [Y]  - FRÉDÉRIC LEROUX ET AL, "[alpha]-Fluorinated Ethers, Thioethers, and Amines: Anomerically Biased Species", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (20050301), vol. 105, no. 3, doi:10.1021/cr040075b, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 827 - 856, XP055004691 [Y] 1-21 * page 848, paragraph 3 - page 849, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr040075b
 [Y]  - B KEVIN PARK ET AL, ANNUAL REVIEW OF PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY, (20010401), vol. 41, no. 1, doi:10.1146/annurev.pharmtox.41.1.443, ISSN 0362-1642, pages 443 - 470, XP055004685 [Y] 1-21 * page 447, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.pharmtox.41.1.443
 [A]  - BUNDSCHUH, "In vivo efficacy in airway disease models of roflumilast, a novel orally active PDE4 inhibitor", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (20010101), vol. 297, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3565, page 280, XP055004687 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9631476
 EP0771794
 EP0943613
 WO2008104175
    - Z. HUANG, J.A. MANCINI, CURRENT MED. CHEM., (2006), vol. 13, pages 3253 - 3262
    - M.D. HOUSLAY ET AL., DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (2005), vol. 10, no. 22, pages 1503 - 1519
    - JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (1986), vol. 87, no. 3, pages 372 - 6
    - V. BOSWELL SMITH, D. SPINA, CURR. OPINION INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2006), vol. 6, no. 11, pages 1136 - 1141
    - C. KROEGEL, M. FOERSTER, EXP. OPINION INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2007), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 109 - 124
    - B. LIPWORTH, LANCET, (2005), vol. 365, pages 167 - 175
    - INFLAMMATION & ALLERGY: DRUG TARGETS, (2007), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 17 - 26
    - Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, (1994), vol. 9
    - Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, (1989), vol. 2
    - Modern Pharmaceutics, MARCEL DEKKER, pages 427 - 432
    - Modern Pharmaceutics, MARCEL DEKKER, pages 618 - 619,718-
    - Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, MARCEL DEKKER, vol. 10, pages 191 - 221
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.