blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2608758

EP2608758 - Assembly to facilitate user reconstitution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/27]ASSEMBLY TO FACILITATE USER RECONSTITUTION
[2014/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2016
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.06.2016  [2016/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare S.A.
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH
[2013/27]
Inventor(s)01 / ARIAGNO, Scott
958 W. Wood Street
Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US
02 / HOUGHTON, Frederick Charles II
4671 Meadow Court
Moorpark, California 93021 / US
03 / ROUSH, Daniel E.
9020 Maryland Street
Niles, Illinois 60714 / US
 [2013/27]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
Chapel Quarter
Mount Street
Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/27]Dee, Ian Mark
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Application number, filing date11751767.225.08.2011
WO2011US49135
Priority number, dateUS20100376912P25.08.2010         Original published format: US 376912 P
[2013/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2012027563
Date:01.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2608758
Date:03.07.2013
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2013/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2608758
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.03.2012
ClassificationIPC:A61J1/20
[2013/27]
CPC:
A61J1/2089 (EP,KR,US); A61J1/201 (EP,KR,US); A61J1/2013 (EP,KR,US);
A61J1/2065 (EP,KR,US); A61J1/2075 (EP,KR,US); A61J1/1406 (EP,US);
A61J1/2082 (EP,US); A61J1/2086 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Anordnung für benutzerseitige Rekonstitution[2014/39]
English:Assembly to facilitate user reconstitution[2014/39]
French:Ensemble pour faciliter une reconstitution par un utilisateur[2014/39]
Former [2013/27]ANORDNUNG FÜR BENUTZERSEITIGE REKONSTITUTION
Former [2013/27]ASSEMBLY TO FACILITATE USER RECONSTITUTION
Former [2013/27]ENSEMBLE POUR FACILITER UNE RECONSTITUTION PAR UN UTILISATEUR
Entry into regional phase21.03.2013National basic fee paid 
21.03.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/27]
11.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2015Fee for grant paid
10.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15164909.2  / EP2923688
EP17161182.5  / EP3235489
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.10.2014
Opposition(s)25.04.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0614653  (SUNTORY LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]US2007088315  (HAINDL HANS [DE]);
 [A]DE102006031712  (HAINDL HANS [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.