EP2561069 - LYSOSOMAL STORAGE DISEASE ENZYME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alexion Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 100 College Street New Haven, CT 06510 / US | [2017/07] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Synageva BioPharma Corp. 33 Hayden Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | ||
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Synageva BioPharma Corp. 128 Spring Street, Suite 520 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUINN, Anthony 107 Manet Road Chestnut Hill Massachusetts 02467 / US | 02 /
HARVEY, Alex J. 106 Fox Trace Athens Georgia 30606 / US | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2013/09] | Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11772834.5 | 23.04.2011 | [2017/10] | WO2011US33699 | Priority number, date | US20110432372P | 13.01.2011 Original published format: US 432372 P | US20100456014P | 29.10.2010 Original published format: US 456014 P | US20100403011P | 09.09.2010 Original published format: US 403011 P | US20100396376P | 26.05.2010 Original published format: US 396376 P | US20100343177P | 23.04.2010 Original published format: US 343177 P | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011133960 | Date: | 27.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2561069 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2561069 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/46, A61K31/366, A61K31/397, A61K31/135, A61P3/06, A01K67/027, A61K31/194, C12N9/20, A61K38/38 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
C12N9/20 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K35/00 (RU);
A01K67/0278 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/194 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/385 (IL,KR,US);
A61K38/465 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12Y301/01013 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01K2217/052 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01K2227/30 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01K2267/01 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2740/10041 (IL,KR,US);
C12N2740/11043 (EP);
C12N2740/11045 (EP);
C12N2760/20222 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/09] | C12N9/20, C12N15/55, A61K38/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | BA | 20.11.2012 | ME | 20.11.2012 | Title | German: | ENZYM FÜR DIE LYSOSOMALE SPEICHERKRANKHEIT | [2013/09] | English: | LYSOSOMAL STORAGE DISEASE ENZYME | [2013/09] | French: | ENZYME DES MALADIES LYSOSOMALES | [2013/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 23.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17158770.2 / EP3205351 | EP23159801.2 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | MK | 08.03.2017 | RS | 08.03.2017 | SM | 08.03.2017 | LU | 23.04.2017 | MT | 23.04.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | CY | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 08.03.2017 | |
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | EE | 08.03.2017 | |
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | EE | 08.03.2017 | |
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | EE | 08.03.2017 | |
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | EE | 08.03.2017 | |
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | HR | 08.03.2017 | |
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0156596 (CHILDREN S HOSPITAL RES FOUNDA [US]) [X] 1-13,17-19 * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] *; | [X]US2009178147 (HARVEY ALEX J [US]) [X] 1-13,17-19 * paragraph [0151] *; | [X]US2009297496 (GRABOWSKI GREGORY A [US]) [X] 1-13,17-19 * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] , [0040] *; | [E]WO2012112681 (SHIRE HUMAN GENETIC THERAPIES [US], et al) [E] 1-13,17-19 * paragraphs [0014] , [0105] *; | [X] - IKEDA S ET AL, "Production of recombinant human lysosomal acid lipase in Schizosaccharomyces pombe: Development of a fed-batch fermentation and purification process", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200401), vol. 98, no. 5, ISSN 1389-1723, pages 366 - 373, XP004695391 [X] 1-13,17-19 * abstract * * page 371 column 2 final paragraph to page 372 column 1 first paragraph * | International search | [A]US2010062982 (HARVEY ALEX J [US]); | by applicant | US5897998 | WO0156596 | US2004223960 | US6849257 | US2007092486 | US2007264249 | US2008064862 | US7524626 | US2009178147 | US2009297496 | US2010062982 | WO2012112681 |