EP2627319 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING A DGAT1 INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEN, Hong 11505 Alcinda Lane North Potomac Maryland 20878 / US | 02 /
KUMARAPERUMAL, Natrajan 40-B, Byrne Court Wayne New Jersey 07470 / US | 03 /
NAUSE, Richard Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation One Health Plaza East Hanover New Jersey 07936-1080 / US | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Larbig, Karen Dorothee, et al Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [2013/34] | Application number, filing date | 11779278.8 | 14.10.2011 | [2018/47] | WO2011US56275 | Priority number, date | US20100393103P | 14.10.2010 Original published format: US 393103 P | [2013/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012051488 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2627319 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2627319 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/28, A61K31/444, A61K47/20, A61K47/26, A61K47/38 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/26 (KR);
A61K47/38 (KR);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61K9/2009 (EP,US);
A61K9/2013 (US);
A61K9/2018 (US);
A61K9/2027 (US);
A61K9/2059 (EP,US);
A61K9/2095 (EP,US);
A61K9/2813 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/34] | A61K9/20, A61K31/444, A61K47/20, A61K47/26, A61K47/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Extension states | BA | 14.05.2013 | ME | 14.05.2013 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM DGAT1-HEMMER | [2013/34] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING A DGAT1 INHIBITOR | [2013/34] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT UN INHIBITEUR DGAT1 | [2013/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 10.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.10.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 04.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | HR | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | MK | 21.11.2018 | MT | 21.11.2018 | RS | 21.11.2018 | SM | 21.11.2018 | IS | 21.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
MT | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | HR | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | HR | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | LT | 21.11.2018 | |
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2007126957 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) | Examination | WO2011123401 | by applicant | WO2007126957 |