EP2640262 - SENSOR FOR ACQUIRING PHYSIOLOGICAL SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smart Solutions Technologies, S.L. C/Sierra de Cazorla, 1, 2a planta. Edificio Cimaga 28290 Las Matas (Madrid) / ES | [2015/15] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Smart Solutions Technologies, S.L. C/Sierra de Cazorla, 1, 2a planta. Edificio Cimaga 28290 Las Matas (Madrid) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACIÁ BARBER, Agustin Plaza de la Iglesia 2A, 6 E-28250 Torrelodones (Madrid) / ES | 02 /
LLORCA JUAN, Daniel Via F. Cavallotti 145 interno 1 I-63017 Porto San Giorgio / IT | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Schlich, George William, et al Schlich LLP 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Schlich, George, et al Schlich LLP 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton BN17 5HS / GB | ||
Former [2013/39] | ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 11782449.0 | 16.11.2011 | WO2011EP70296 | Priority number, date | EP20100191590 | 17.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10191590 | US201061427864P | 29.12.2010 Original published format: US 201061427864 P | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012066056 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2640262 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2640262 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0408 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
A61B5/6804 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0205 (US);
A61B5/25 (KR);
A61B5/282 (EP,US);
A61B5/296 (US);
A61B2562/12 (KR);
A61B2562/125 (EP,US);
A61B2562/16 (KR);
A61B2562/227 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSOR ZUM ERFASSEN PHYSIOLOGISCHER SIGNALE | [2013/39] | English: | SENSOR FOR ACQUIRING PHYSIOLOGICAL SIGNALS | [2013/39] | French: | CAPTEUR PERMETTANT L'ACQUISITION DE SIGNAUX PHYSIOLOGIQUES | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2011 | AL | 08.04.2015 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | MK | 08.04.2015 | MT | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | RS | 08.04.2015 | SK | 08.04.2015 | SM | 08.04.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.11.2011 | |
BG | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MK | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 16.11.2011 | |
BG | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | EE | 08.04.2015 | |
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | EE | 08.04.2015 | |
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 08.04.2015 | |
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | LT | 08.04.2015 | |
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | LT | 08.04.2015 | |
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006094948 (GOUGH PAUL A [GB], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0029] - [0037]; figures 2,4a-4c * [I] 2-8,11-14; | [XI]US2006095001 (MATSUMURA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0091] , [0092] , [0109]; figures 7A,7B * [I] 2-8; | [A]US2007060859 (KANAMURA KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 2-5 * paragraphs [0225] , [0230]; figures 7A,7B *; | [A]US2010234715 (SHIN SEUNG-CHUL [KR], et al) [A] 1-3,9-13* paragraphs [0057] - [0059] - [0063] , [0070] , [0079] , [0080]; figures 1-4,10,11 * | by applicant | EP1361819 | EP2072009 | US2010234715 |