EP2582391 - ARTHRITIS TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XBiotech, Inc 1055 West Hastings Street, Suite 300 Vancouver, British Columbia V6E 2E9 / CA | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMARD, John 8201 East Riverside Drive Bldg. 4, Suite 100 Austin, TX 78744 / US | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/40] |
Former [2013/17] | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11796483.3 | 17.06.2011 | [2018/40] | WO2011US40819 | Priority number, date | US20100356176P | 18.06.2010 Original published format: US 356176 P | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011159976 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2582391 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2582391 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P19/02, A61P19/00, A61P29/00 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
C07K16/245 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K9/0019 (KR);
A61K9/0048 (KR);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP,KR);
A61P27/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/39533 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | 18.01.2013 | ME | 18.01.2013 | Title | German: | ARTHRITIS-BEHANDLUNG | [2013/17] | English: | ARTHRITIS TREATMENT | [2013/17] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE L'ARTHRITE | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 28.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.02.2018 | 27.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2011 | AL | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | MT | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | LU | 17.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.06.2011 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | HR | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | HR | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | HR | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007120828 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [Y]US2009298096 (SIMARD JOHN [US]); | [XY]WO2010030979 (XBIOTECH INC [CA], et al); | Examination | US2009215992 | by applicant | US4634664 | US5530101 | US5585089 | US5693762 | US5932188 | WO2007120828 | US2008050310 | US2009298096 | WO2010030979 | US2012015384 | WO1990US01383 |