blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2554172

EP2554172 - Method for treatment of diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.06.2015
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
373 Inverness Parkway
Suite 200
Englewood, CO 80112 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
373 Inverness Parkway, Suite 200
Englewood, CO 80112 / US
Former [2013/52]For all designated states
Ampio Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
5445 DTC Parkway
Suite 925
Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US
Former [2013/13]For all designated states
DMI Acquisition Corp.
5445 DTC Parkway, Suite 925
Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US
Former [2013/06]For all designated states
DMI Acquisition Corp.
8400 E. Crescent Parkway
Suite 600
Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bar-Or, David
900 E. Oxford Lane
Englewood, Colorado 80110 / US
 [2013/06]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/06]Hoefer & Partner
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date12007362.222.06.2010
[2013/06]
Priority number, dateUS20090219185P22.06.2009         Original published format: US 219185 P
US20100315350P18.03.2010         Original published format: US 315350 P
[2013/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2554172
Date:06.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2554172
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2013
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/58, A61P7/10
[2013/06]
CPC:
A61K31/58 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61K9/0053 (KR,US); A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP); A61P15/00 (EP); A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP); A61P25/00 (EP); A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP); A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP); A61P7/10 (EP); A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP); A61P9/12 (EP); A61P9/14 (EP);
A61K2121/00 (KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/06]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Krankheitsbehandlung[2014/33]
English:Method for treatment of diseases[2013/06]
French:Procédé de traitement de maladies[2014/33]
Former [2013/06]Verfahren zur Krankheitsbehandlung
Former [2013/06]Procédé de traitement de maladies
Examination procedure12.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/06]
02.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2014Fee for grant paid
03.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10792567.9  / EP2326332
Opposition(s)15.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL13.08.2014
CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MK13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
SM13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MK13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
SM13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2017/38]CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
SM13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2017/03]CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
MT13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2016/09]CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
MC13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2015/50]CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
SI13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY13.08.2014
CZ13.08.2014
EE13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
SK13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY13.08.2014
HR13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
LV13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
IS13.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY13.08.2014
LT13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
Former [2015/10]LT13.08.2014
BG13.11.2014
Former [2015/08]LT13.08.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO03086178  (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 4, paragraph 14 - paragraph 15 *;
 [Y]US2005233965  (SCHWARTZ MARTIN A [US], et al) [Y] 1-9* paragraph [0084] *;
 [Y]WO2007009087  (DMI BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, line 10 - line 29 * * page 3, line 16 - line 20 * * page 21, line 25 - page 22, line 6 * * examples 4-6 *
by applicantGB905844
 US3135743
 US5407926
 US6060463
 WO0130337
 WO0168053
 WO2004043480
 WO2004058289
 US2005101582
 WO2007009087
    - ICHIMURA ET AL., J. AM SOC. NEPHROL., (2008), vol. 19, pages 1463 - 1471
    - FRANK ET AL., CELL TISSUE RES., (2009), vol. 335, pages 41 - 47
    - SIMIONESCU ET AL., CELL TISSUE RES., (2009), vol. 335, pages 27 - 40
    - VAN DEN BERG ET AL., J. CYST. FIBROS., (2008), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 515 - 519
    - VIAZZI ET AL., HYPERTENS. RES., (2008), vol. 31, pages 873 - 879
    - ANTONETTI ET AL., Diabetic Retinopathy, HUMANA PRESS, (2008), vol. 14, pages 340 - 342
    - FELINSKI ET AL., CURRENT EYE RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 30, pages 949 - 957
    - PASCARIU ET AL., JOURNAL OF HISTOCHEMISTRY & CYTOCHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 52, no. 1, pages 65 - 76
    - BOUCHARD ET AL., DIABETOLOGIA, (2002), vol. 45, pages 1017 - 1025
    - ARSHI ET AL., LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, (2000), vol. 80, no. 8, pages 1171 - 1184
    - VINORES ET AL., DOCUMENTA OPHTHALMOLOGICA, (1999), vol. 97, pages 217 - 228
    - OOMEN ET AL., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1999), vol. 29, pages 1035 - 1040
    - VINORES ET AL., PATHOL. RES. PRACT., (1998), vol. 194, pages 497 - 505
    - ANTONETTI ET AL., DIABETES, (1998), vol. 47, pages 1953 - 1959
    - POPOV ET AL., ACTA DIABETOL., (1997), vol. 34, pages 285 - 293
    - YAMAJI ET AL., CIRCULATION RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 72, pages 947 - 957
    - VINORES ET AL., HISTOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1993), vol. 25, pages 648 - 663
    - BEALS, MICROVASCULAR RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 45, pages 11 - 19
    - CALDWELL ET AL., INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOL. VISUAL SCI., (1992), vol. 33, no. 5, page 16101619
    - SATCHELL ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. RENAL PHYSIOL., (2009), vol. 296, pages F947 - F956
    - HARALDSSON ET AL., CURR. OPIN. NEPHROL. HYPERTENS., (2009), vol. 18, pages 331 - 335
    - ICHIMURA, J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2008), vol. 19, pages 1463 - 1471
    - BALLERMANN, NEPHRON PHYSIOL., (2007), vol. 106, pages 19 - 25
    - TOYODA ET AL., DIABETES, (2007), vol. 56, pages 2155 - 2160
    - "Endothelial Structures Involved In Vascular Permeability", STAN, Endothelial Biomedicine, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (2007), pages 679 - 688
    - "Functional Ultrastructure of the Vascular Endothelium: Changes in Various Pathologies", SIMIONESCU; ANTOHE, The Vascular Endothelium I, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (2006), pages 42 - 69
    - YOKOMORI, MED. MOL. MORPHOL., (2008), vol. 41, pages 1 - 4
    - "The Hepatic Sinusoidal Endothelial Cell", DELEVE, Endothelial Biomedicine, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (2007), pages 1226 - 1238
    - "Normal Endothelium", PRIES; KUEBLER, The Vascular Endothelium I, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (2006), pages 1 - 40
    - "Functional Ultrastmcture of the Vascular Endothelium: Changes in Various Pathologies", SIMIONESCU; ANTOHE, The Vascular Endothelium I, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (2006), pages 42 - 69
    - BRAET; WISSE, COMPARATIVE HEPATOLOGY, (2002), vol. 1, pages 1 - 17
    - KANAI ET AL., ANAT. REC., (1996), vol. 244, pages 175 - 181
    - KEMPKA ET AL., EXP. CELL RES., (1988), vol. 176, pages 38 - 48
    - KISHIMOTO ET AL., AM. J. ANAT., (1987), vol. 178, pages 241 - 249
    - ELIA DUH, Diabetic Retinopathy, HUMAN PRESS, (2008), page 9
    - DIABETIC RETINOPHTHY, pages 474 - 477
 US20100820325
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.