blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2540350

EP2540350 - COMBINATIONS OF A MACROCYCLIC QUINOXALINE COMPOUND WHICH IS AN HCV NS3 PROTEASE INHIBITOR WITH OTHER HCV AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/01]Combinations of a macrocyclic quinoxaline compound which is an HCV NS3 protease inhibitors with other HCV agents
[2013/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.03.2015
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 01.06.2016  [2016/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
For all designated states
MSD Italia S.r.l.
Via Vitorchiano, 151
00189 Rome / IT
[2014/21]
Former [2013/01]For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
For all designated states
Istituto di ricerche di Biologia Molecolare P. Angeletti S.R.L.
Via Vitorchiano 151
CAP 00189 Rome / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Harper, Steven
IRBM
Via Pontina Km 30.600
Pomezia
I-00040 Rome / IT
02 / Summa, Vincenzo
IRBM
Via Pontina Km 30.600
Pomezia
I-00040 Rome / IT
03 / Liverton, Nigel J.
MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
04 / McCauley, John A.
MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
 [2013/01]
Representative(s)Horgan, James Michael Frederic
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
120 Moorgate
London, EC2M 6UR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/01]Horgan, James Michael Frederic
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
Application number, filing date12181546.817.07.2009
[2013/01]
Priority number, dateUS20080135559P22.07.2008         Original published format: US 135559 P
[2013/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2540350
Date:02.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2540350
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2012
ClassificationIPC:A61P31/14, A61K38/06, A61K38/07, A61K38/08, C07K5/08, C07K5/10, C07K5/12
[2013/01]
CPC:
C07K5/0808 (EP,US); C07D241/36 (KR); A61K31/498 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP); A61P31/00 (EP); A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP); A61P31/22 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D403/12 (KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/01]
Extension statesAL02.07.2013
BA02.07.2013
RS02.07.2013
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONEN EINER MAKROCYCLISCHEN CHINOXALINVERBINDUNG, DIE EIN HCV-NS3-PROTEASEHEMMER IST, MIT ANDEREN HCV-MITTELN[2013/38]
English:COMBINATIONS OF A MACROCYCLIC QUINOXALINE COMPOUND WHICH IS AN HCV NS3 PROTEASE INHIBITOR WITH OTHER HCV AGENTS[2013/38]
French:COMBINAISONS D'UN COMPOSÉ DE QUINOXALINE MACROCYCLIQUE QUI EST UN DES INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTÉASE HCV NS3 AVEC D'AUTRES AGENTS HCV[2013/38]
Former [2013/01]Kombinationen einer makrocyclischen Chinoxalinverbindung, die ein HCV-NS3-Proteasehemmer ist, mit anderen HCV-Mitteln
Former [2013/01]Combinations of a macrocyclic quinoxaline compound which is an HCV NS3 protease inhibitors with other HCV agents
Former [2013/01]Combinaisons d'un composé de quinoxaline macrocyclique qui est un des inhibiteurs de la protéase HCV NS3 avec d'autres agents HCV
Examination procedure02.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/33]
22.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2014Fee for grant paid
02.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
08.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09790553.3  / EP2310095
Opposition(s)24.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
08.04.2014Request for further processing filed
08.04.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.04.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC21.05.2014
SM21.05.2014
[2016/22]
Former [2016/21]MC21.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO2008057209  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al)
by applicantUS3480613
 WO9741211
 WO9822496
 WO9846630
 WO9907733
 WO9907734
 WO9938888
 WO9943691
 WO9950230
 GB2337262
 WO9964442
 WO0009543
 WO0025780
 WO0059929
 WO0100622
 WO0147883
 WO0160379
 WO0168663
 WO0177091
 WO0179246
 US6323180
 WO0190121
 WO0192282
 WO0204425
 WO0206246
 US2002019363
 WO0218404
 WO0220497
 WO0232920
 WO0248116
 WO0248172
 WO0248165
 WO02051425
 WO02057287
 WO02057425
 US2002107138
 WO02100415
 WO03026589
 WO03026675
 WO03068244
 WO03093290
 US2003236216
 WO2004000858
 WO2004002999
 WO2004003000
 WO2004002422
 US2004006007
 WO2004003138
 WO2004007512
 WO2004011478
 WO2004013300
 US2004063658
 WO2004028481
 US2004067901
 US6777392
 WO2005003147
 US2005038240
 WO2005016927
 WO2006021341
 WO2006102087
 WO2006119061
 WO2007015785
 WO2007016441
 WO2007148135
 WO2008051475
 WO2008051477
 WO2008051514
 WO2008057209
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.