EP2683385 - 2,4 SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINEDIAMINES FOR USE IN DISCOID LUPUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/03] | 2,4 SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINEDIAMINES FOR USE IN DISCOID LUPUS | ||
[2018/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2014/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGILAVY, Daniel 1933 Laguna Street San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | 02 /
PINE, Polly 786 Partridge Ave. Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2014/03] | Sexton, Jane Helen J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12711500.4 | 09.03.2012 | [2018/23] | WO2012US28429 | Priority number, date | US201161451531P | 10.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161451531 P | [2014/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012122452 | Date: | 13.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2683385 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2683385 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, A61P17/00 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
C07D239/48 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/03] | A61K31/506, A61P17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 2,4 SUBSTITUTIERTE PYRIMIDINEDIAMINE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DISCOIDEM LUPUS | [2018/04] | English: | 2,4 SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINEDIAMINES FOR USE IN DISCOID LUPUS | [2018/04] | French: | PYRIMIDINEDIAMINES 2,4 SUBSTITUTIÉS POUR L'UTILISATION DANS LUPUS CHRONIQUE | [2018/04] |
Former [2014/03] | 2,4-SUBSTITUIERTE PYRIMIDINDIAMINE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DISKOIDEM LUPUS | ||
Former [2014/03] | 2,4 SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINEDIAMINES FOR USE IN DISCOID LUPUS | ||
Former [2014/03] | PYRIMIDINEDIAMINES 2,4-SUBSTITUÉES POUR APPLICATION AU TRAITEMENT DU LUPUS DISCOÏDE | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 28.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US7491732 (LI HUI [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * claims 1,4 * * column 104, lines 9-25 * * column 113, lines 8, 48, 45 * * column 115, line 48 * * examples 41-44 *; | [XI] - CHANG B Y ET AL, "JAK3 inhibition significantly attenuates psoriasiform skin inflammation in CD18 mutant PL/J mice", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY 20090801 AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS USA LNKD- DOI:10.4049/JIMMUNOL.0804063, (20090801), vol. 183, no. 3, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2183 - 2192, XP055025639 [X] 13-15 * abstract * * page 2183, columns r-h, paragraph 2 * * page 2184, columns l-h, paragraph 1 and 2 * * "Results"; page 2185, columns l-h, paragraph l - page 2191, columns l-h, paragraph 1; figures 1-6; tables I-III * * Materials and Methods; page 2184, columns l-h; figures 3A-3E * * "Discussion"; page 2191, columns l-h, paragraph 2 - page 2192, columns l-h, paragraph 1 * [I] 1-12,16-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.0804063 | Examination | - Paolo Fabbri ET AL, "Cutaneous lupus erythematosus Scientific editor: Prof Benvenuto Giannotti", (20040101), URL: https://www.orpha.net/data/patho/GB/uk-Cutaneous-lupus-erythematosus.pdf, (20160609), XP055279452 | by applicant | US4256108 | US4166452 | US4265874 | US7491732 | US2007203161 | US296006 | US6010715 | US5591767 | US5008110 | US5683712 | US5948433 | US5965154 | - ROTHFIELD ET AL., CLINICS IN DERMATOLOGY, (2006), vol. 24, pages 348 - 362 | - "General Principles", FINGL; WOODBURY, Goodman and Gilman's 1he Pharmaceutical Basis of therapeutics, PERGAMON PRESS, pages 1 - 46 | - REMINGTON, The Science and Practice of Pharmacy(21" edition), (2006), pages 872 - 882 | - GHOREISHI; DUTZ, LUPUS, (2010), vol. 19, pages 1029 - 1035 | - FURUKAWA; YOSHIMASU, AUTOIMMUNITY REVIEWS, (2005), vol. 4, pages 345 - 350 | - GUIDUCCI ET AL., JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2010), vol. 207, pages 2931 - 2942 | - A Fonnulary of Cosmetic Preparations (Vol. 2)--Creams, Lotions and Milks, MICELLE PRESS, (1993), vol. 2 | - "oils and gels", ANTHONY L. L. HUNTING, A Fonnulary of Cosmetic Preparations, pages 5 - 14 | - "bases and emulsions", ANTHONY L. L. HUNTING, A Fonnulary of Cosmetic Preparations, pages 15 - 98 | - "ll-purpose products", ANTHONY L. L. HUNTING, A Fonnulary of Cosmetic Preparations, pages 101 - 120 | - "cleansing masks, creams, lotions", ANTHONY L. L. HUNTING, A Fonnulary of Cosmetic Preparations, pages 121 - 184 | - "foundation, vanishing and day creams", ANTHONY L. L. HUNTING, A Fonnulary of Cosmetic Preparations, pages 185 - 208 | - "emollients", ANTHONY L. L. HUNTING, A Fonnulary of Cosmetic Preparations, pages 209 - 254 | - "facial treatment products", ANTHONY L. L. HUNTING, A Fonnulary of Cosmetic Preparations, pages 297 - 324 | - "hand products", ANTHONY L. L. HUNTING, A Fonnulary of Cosmetic Preparations, pages 325 - 380 | - "body and skin creams and lotions", ANTHONY L. L. HUNTING, A Fonnulary of Cosmetic Preparations, pages 381 - 460 | - "baby products", ANTHONY L. L. HUNTING, A Fonnulary of Cosmetic Preparations, pages 461 - 484 |