EP2646039 - A COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF IN THE TREATMENT OF ANAL RHAGADES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THD S.p.A. Via Dell'Industria 1 42015 Correggio, Reggio Emilia / IT | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASTIA, Filippo Via Canale 564 I-41019 Sozzigalli di Soliera (Modena) / IT | 02 /
SACCOMANNO, Maurizio Via Ancona 27 I-73014 Gallipoli (Lecce) / IT | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Biggi, Cristina Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Biggi, Cristina c/o Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12716670.0 | 30.01.2012 | WO2012IT00027 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013114410 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2646039 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2646039 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/185, A61K31/716, A61K9/00, A61K47/10, A61K47/36 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
A61K31/716 (EP,RU,US);
A61K38/168 (US);
A61K36/185 (EP,RU,US);
A61K38/011 (US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (RU);
A61K9/0031 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/716, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2013/41] | A61K31/716, A61K36/185, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON ANALRHAGADEN | [2013/41] | English: | A COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF IN THE TREATMENT OF ANAL RHAGADES | [2013/41] | French: | COMPOSITION ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE RHAGADES ANALES | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 17.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2012 | AL | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MK | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | SM | 14.05.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MK | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2004051533 ; | [I]WO9846205 (SEROBIOLOGIQUES SOCIETE ANONYM [FR], et al) [I] 1-28,33-38 * example -; claim - *; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 17, Database accession no. 2004-174827, XP002681035 & JP2004051533 A 20040219 (ICHIMARU PHARCOS INC) [X] 1-6,11,17,18,27,28 * abstract * [I] 1-28,33-38 | [I] - BRYANT L A ET AL, "PROCESSING, FUNCTIONAL, AND NUTRITIONAL PROPERTIES OF OKRA SEED PRODUCTS", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, INC, US, (19880101), vol. 53, no. 3, doi:10.1111/J.1365-2621.1988.TB08960.X, ISSN 0022-1147, pages 810 - 816, XP002049248 [I] 1-28,33-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.1988.tb08960.x | by applicant | WO9846205 | JP2004051533 |