EP2790681 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN EXTENDED RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION COMPRISING POLYMER COATED PROTEIN MICROPARTICLES USING SPRAY-DRYING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/43] | POLYMER PROTEIN MICROPARTICLES | ||
[2019/38] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Correction of patent specification | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2023/08] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Hunter 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | 02 /
WALSH, Scott 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/08] |
Former [2020/04] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2014/43] | Power, David J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12795967.4 | 18.11.2012 | [2020/04] | WO2012US65735 | Priority number, date | US201161561525P | 18.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161561525 P | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013075068 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2790681 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2790681 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2790681 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2790681 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50, A61K38/17, A61K39/00, A61P27/02, A61K9/16 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A61K9/1623 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/5089 (IL,US);
A61K47/34 (IL,RU);
A61K9/5031 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/179 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (IL,RU);
A61K47/36 (IL,RU);
A61K9/14 (IL,RU,US);
A61K9/1611 (IL,US);
A61K9/1617 (IL,US);
A61K9/1641 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/5047 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P27/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | 17.06.2014 | ME | 17.06.2014 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PHARMAZEUTISCHEN RETARDFORMULIERUNG UMFASSEND POLYMERÜBERZOGENE PROTEINMIKROPARTIKEL UNTER VERWENUNG VON SPRÜHTROCKNUNG | [2019/38] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN EXTENDED RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION COMPRISING POLYMER COATED PROTEIN MICROPARTICLES USING SPRAY-DRYING | [2019/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE FORMULATION PHARMACEUTIQUE À LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE COMPRENANT MICROPARTICULES DE PROTÉINE REVÊTUES DE POLYMÈRE EN UTILISANT SÉCHAGE PAR ATOMISATION | [2019/38] |
Former [2014/43] | POLYMERPROTEINMIKROPARTIKEL | ||
Former [2014/43] | POLYMER PROTEIN MICROPARTICLES | ||
Former [2014/43] | MICROPARTICULES DE PROTÉINE ET DE POLYMÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 10.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18173299.1 / EP3384903 | EP19180351.9 / EP3574897 | EP22150172.9 / EP4026543 | EP24190921.7 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.10.2020
Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB Opponent's representative Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.10.2020
Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB Opponent's representative Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | 03.11.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.03.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.05.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.06.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.01.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.01.2020 | AT | 22.01.2020 | CY | 22.01.2020 | CZ | 22.01.2020 | EE | 22.01.2020 | HR | 22.01.2020 | LT | 22.01.2020 | LV | 22.01.2020 | MC | 22.01.2020 | MK | 22.01.2020 | MT | 22.01.2020 | RO | 22.01.2020 | RS | 22.01.2020 | SI | 22.01.2020 | SK | 22.01.2020 | SM | 22.01.2020 | TR | 22.01.2020 | BG | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.04.2020 | IS | 22.05.2020 | PT | 14.06.2020 | LU | 18.11.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 22.01.2020 | |
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | HR | 22.01.2020 | |
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 22.01.2020 | |
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 22.01.2020 | |
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 22.01.2020 | |
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 22.01.2020 | |
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | RS | 22.01.2020 | |
PT | 14.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO03092665 (MASSACHUSETTS EYE & EAR INFIRM [US], et al); | [XYI]US2008305115 (TICE THOMAS R [US], et al); | [XYI]US2011104151 (NETTLES HEATHER [US], et al); | by applicant | US4210529 | US4304767 | US4764364 | US5968543 | US6063910 | US6927004 | US7087411 | US7279159 | US7365165 | US7572893 | US7608261 | US7655758 | US7807164 | US2010279933 | US2011171241 | US7998477 | WO2011US54856 | Opposition | US2007292475 | US2011212180 |