EP2788641 - A PRESSURE RELIEF VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pres-Vac Engineering ApS Svanevang 3 3450 Allerød / DK | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALMQVIST, Ronni Bryggervangen 20 st. 2 DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2015/50] |
Former [2014/42] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 12806001.9 | 10.12.2012 | [2015/50] | WO2012EP74933 | Priority number, date | DK201170694P | 09.12.2011 Original published format: DK 201170694 P | US201161568848P | 09.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161568848 P | [2014/43] |
Former [2014/42] | DK0 | 09.12.2011 | |
US201161568848P | 09.12.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013083832 | Date: | 13.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2788641 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2788641 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/12, F16K24/04, B65D90/34, F16K31/08 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
F16K17/12 (EP,CN,US);
F16K31/084 (EP,CN,US);
B65D90/32 (EP,CN,US);
B65D90/34 (EP,US);
F16K24/04 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T137/774 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKENTLASTUNGSVENTIL | [2014/42] | English: | A PRESSURE RELIEF VALVE | [2014/42] | French: | SOUPAPE DE SÛRETÉ DE PRESSION | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 26.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2012 | AL | 09.12.2015 | AT | 09.12.2015 | BE | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | ES | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | MK | 09.12.2015 | MT | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | RS | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | SM | 09.12.2015 | IE | 10.12.2015 | LU | 10.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.12.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 10.12.2015 | ||
LU | 10.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 10.12.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 10.12.2015 | ||
LU | 10.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 10.12.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 10.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 10.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XDYI]US5060688 (SORENSEN EMIL A [CH]) [XD] 1,9-11 * the whole document * [Y] 13-15 [I] 2-8,12; | [YD]US2004177883 (SORENSEN EMIL AARESTRUP [CH], et al) [YD] 13-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2005038325 (TANK TECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,9-11 * the whole document * [I] 4-8,12; | [AD]US5873384 (SOERENSEN EMIL AARESTRUP [GB], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5060688 | US2004177883 | US5873384 |