EP2797652 - INHALATION DEVICE WITH FEEDBACK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vectura GmbH Robert-Koch-Allee 29 82131 Gauting / DE | [2016/24] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Vectura GmbH Wohraer Strasse 37 35285 Gemünden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLB, Tobias Lindenallee 29 82061 Neuried / DE | 02 /
HOFFMANN, Tobias Grubenweg 16a 82005 Gilching / DE | 03 /
SCHWENDNER, Sebastian Dietschweg 38a 82140 Olching / DE | 04 /
HUBER, Martin Lena-Christ-Straße 3 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | 05 /
MÜLLINGER, Bernhard Hansastraße 108 81373 München / DE | [2014/47] |
Former [2014/45] | 01 /
KOLB, Tobias Hansastrasse 108 81373 Munich / DE | ||
02 /
HOFFMANN, Tobias Grubenweg 16a 82005 Gilching / DE | |||
03 /
SCHWENDNER, Sebastian Dietschweg 38a 82140 Olching / DE | |||
04 /
HUBER, Martin Kreisstrasse 15 82281 Egenhofen / DE | |||
05 /
MÜLLINGER, Bernhard Renatastrasse 29 80634 München / DE | Representative(s) | Summersell, Richard John, et al Vectura Limited 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0GZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | Summersell, Richard John Vectura Ltd One Prospect West Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB | ||
Former [2014/45] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12820859.2 | 27.12.2012 | [2018/47] | WO2012EP76963 | Priority number, date | EP20110195773 | 27.12.2011 Original published format: EP 11195773 | EP20120190139 | 26.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12190139 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013098334 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2797652 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2797652 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/00, A61M15/00, A61B5/08, // A61M16/00 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
A61M15/002 (EP,KR,US);
A61M11/005 (KR,US);
A61M11/00 (US);
A61M11/003 (KR);
A61M15/008 (KR);
A61M15/0083 (KR);
A61M15/0085 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/18 (KR,US);
A61M2205/3303 (KR,US);
A61M2205/3331 (KR);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/43 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/44 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/52 (KR);
A61M2205/581 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | A61M15/00, A61B5/08, A61M16/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHALATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT FEEDBACK-SYSTEM | [2018/07] | English: | INHALATION DEVICE WITH FEEDBACK SYSTEM | [2014/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INHALATION DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉTROACTION | [2018/07] |
Former [2014/45] | INHALATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM FEEDBACK-SYSTEM | ||
Former [2014/45] | DISPOSITIF D'INHALATION AVEC UN SYSTÈME DE RÉTROACTION | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 17.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 15.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | HR | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | MK | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | RS | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | SM | 21.11.2018 | LU | 27.12.2018 | MT | 27.12.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/08] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
MT | 27.12.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | HR | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | HR | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 21.11.2018 | |
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | Cited in | International search | [YDA]US5906202 (SCHUSTER JEFFREY A [US], et al) [YD] 18 * column 16, line 18 - line 34; figures 3,4 * * column 27, line 29 - column 28, line 5 * [A] 17; | [XD]US2005087189 (CROCKFORD DAVID R [US], et al) [XD] 1-4,7,8,10-12,14 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-4 *; | [YD]EP2283887 (ACTIVAERO GMBH [DE]) [YD] 9 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1a-1d * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0044] *; | [XDY]WO2011083377 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [XD] 1-8,10-12,14,17 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-12 * [Y] 9,13,15,16,18; | [YDA]US2011196252 (GANSHORN PETER [DE]) [YD] 13,15,16 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066]; figure 1 * [A] 4,11,12; | [AD]US2011226242 (VON HOLLEN DIRK [US], et al) [AD] 1,4* paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065]; figure 39 * | by applicant | US5906202 | US2005087189 | EP2283887 | WO2011083377 | US2011226242 | EP2283887 | - TIDDENS ET AL., JOURNAL OF AEROSOL MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 456 - 465 |