EP2814840 - FACTOR VIII COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioverativ Therapeutics Inc. 225 Second Avenue Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2019/46] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states Bioverativ Therapeutics Inc. 225 Second Avenue Waltham, MA 02451 / US | ||
Former [2017/50] | For all designated states Amunix Operating Inc. 500 Ellis Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
For all designated states Bioverativ Therapeutics Inc. 225 Second Avenue Waltham MA 02451 / US | |||
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Amunix Operating Inc. 500 Ellis Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 250 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | |||
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Amunix Operating Inc. 500 Ellis Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
For all designated states Biogen Idec MA Inc. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHELLENBERGER, Volker 914 Moreno Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Pei-yun 2395 Sharon Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
VARFAJ, Fatbardha 127 Wilson Way Larkspur, CA 94939 / US | 04 /
DING, Sheng 362 Chesapeake Avenue Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 05 /
SILVERMAN, Joshua 829 Dartshire Way Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 06 /
WANG, Chia-wei 652 Barto Street Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 07 /
SPINK, Benjamin 379 Northam Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 08 /
STEMMER, Willem, P. 108 Kathy Court Los Gatos, CA 95051 / US | 09 /
GEETHING, Nathan 2009 Garzoni Place Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 10 /
KULMAN, John 88 Creeley Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 11 /
LIU, Tongyao 53 Buckman Drive Lexington, MI 02421 / US | 12 /
TOBY, Garabet, G. 9 School Hill Lane North Reading, MA 01864 / US | 13 /
JIANG, Haiyan 3 Bayberry Lane Bilmont, MA 02478 / US | 14 /
PETERS, Robert 53 Parkinson Street Needham, MA 02492 / US | 15 /
WANG, Deping 2336 Meadow Lane Furlong, PA 18925 / US | 16 /
MEI, Baisong 353 Woodward Street Waban, MA 02468 / US | [2015/02] |
Former [2014/52] | 01 /
SCHELLENBERGER, Volker 914 Moreno Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
02 /
CHANG, Pei-yun 2395 Sharon Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
03 /
VARFAJ, Fatbardha 127 Wilson Way Larkspur, CA 94939 / US | |||
04 /
DING, Sheng 36 Duane Street Apt. 1 Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | |||
05 /
SILVERMAN, Joshua 829 Dartshire Way Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | |||
06 /
WANG, Chia-wei 652 Barto Street Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | |||
07 /
SPINK, Benjamin 379 Northam Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
08 /
STEMMER, Willem, P. 108 Kathy Court Los Gatos, CA 95051 / US | |||
09 /
GEETHING, Nathan 2009 Garzoni Place Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | |||
10 /
KULMAN, John 88 Creeley Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | |||
11 /
LIU, Tongyao 53 Buckman Drive Lexington, MI 02421 / US | |||
12 /
TOBY, Garabet, G. 9 School Hill Lane North Reading, MA 01864 / US | |||
13 /
JIANG, Haiyan 3 Bayberry Lane Bilmont, MA 02478 / US | |||
14 /
PETERS, Robert 53 Parkinson Street Needham, MA 02492 / US | |||
15 /
WANG, Deping 2336 Meadow Lane Furlong, PA 18925 / US | |||
16 /
MEI, Baisong 353 Woodward Street Waban, MA 02468 / US | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Böhmer, Thomas ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/52] | Miller, David James, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12868427.1 | 11.07.2012 | [2019/46] | WO2012US46326 | Priority number, date | US201261599400P | 15.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261599400 P | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013122617 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2814840 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2814840 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/755, A61K38/37, A61K38/00 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
C07K14/755 (EP,CN,US);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2319/00 (CN);
C07K2319/31 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | C07K14/755, A61K38/37 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAKTOR-VIII-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2014/52] | English: | FACTOR VIII COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME | [2014/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DU FACTEUR VIII ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 02.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19165518.2 / EP3564260 | EP22202315.2 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.01.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | IS | 13.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2020/38] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | IS | 13.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008077616 (CSL BEHRING GMBH [DE], et al); | [YD]WO2012006623 (BIOGEN IDEC HEMOPHILIA INC [US], et al); | [E]WO2013123457 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US]); | International search | [A]US2006122376 (CHAPMAN BARBARA [US], et al); | [Y]US2010239554 (SCHELLENBERGER VOLKER [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011069164 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al); | [AP]WO2012007324 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | Examination | WO2010091122 |