EP2623605 - RAAV vector compositions having tyrosine-modified capsid proteins and methods for use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. P.O. Box 115500 Gainesville, FL 32611 / US | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhong, Li 2601 NW 23rd Blvd. Apt 142 Gainesville, FL Florida 32605 / US | 02 /
Zolotukhin, Sergei 1122 SW 96 Gainesville, FL Florida 32607 / US | 03 /
Govindasamy, Lakshmanan 908 SW 16th Avenue Gainesville, FL Florida 32601 / US | 04 /
Agbandje-McKenna, Mavis 10202 SW 17th Place Gainesville, FL Florida 32607 / US | 05 /
Srivastava, Arun 3823 SW 92nd Drive Gainesville, FL Florida 32608 / US | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2018/48] |
Former [2013/32] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13154078.3 | 08.04.2008 | [2013/32] | Priority number, date | US20070910798P | 09.04.2007 Original published format: US 910798 P | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2623605 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2623605 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/864, A61K38/16, A61K48/00 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/76 (US);
A61K48/0008 (US);
A61K48/005 (KR,US);
A61K48/0091 (EP,US);
C12N15/861 (US);
C12N15/8645 (US);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K2039/5158 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2750/14122 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2750/14132 (US);
C12N2750/14141 (KR);
C12N2750/14142 (US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/48] |
Former [2013/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | rAAV-Vektorzusammensetzungen mit tyrosinmodifizierten Kapsidproteinen und Verwendungsverfahren dafür | [2013/32] | English: | RAAV vector compositions having tyrosine-modified capsid proteins and methods for use | [2013/32] | French: | Compositions de vecteur RAAV comprenant des protéines de capside à tyrosine modifié et procédés d'utilisation | [2013/32] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 29.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08733161.7 / EP2191001 | Divisional application(s) | EP18201865.5 / EP3492596 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080733161) is 27.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2008 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | HR | 28.11.2018 | LT | 28.11.2018 | LV | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | MT | 28.11.2018 | PL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | BG | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | IS | 28.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | LU | 08.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.04.2008 | |
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 28.11.2018 | |
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 28.11.2018 | |
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | CZ | 28.11.2018 | |
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 28.11.2018 | |
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | CZ | 28.11.2018 | |
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 28.11.2018 | |
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 28.11.2018 | |
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 28.11.2018 | |
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 28.11.2018 | |
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 28.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03006616 (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US], et al); | [A]US7052692 (SRIVASTAVA ARUN [US], et al); | Examination | WO03052052 | WO2006110689 | by applicant | US4216209 | US4237244 | US4554101 | US4683195 | US4683202 | GB2202328 | WO8810315 | US4800159 | WO8906700 | EP0329822 | US4883750 | WO9007641 | US4987071 | US5037746 | US5093246 | US5098887 | US5116742 | US5145684 | US5219727 | US5238921 | US5279721 | US5297721 | US5334711 | US5348978 | US5354855 | US5399363 | US5399346 | US5455166 | US5466468 | US5543158 | US5552157 | US5552397 | US5565213 | US5567434 | US5580579 | US5602306 | US5631359 | US5639655 | US5639940 | US5641515 | US5646020 | US5646031 | US5648211 | US5656016 | US5697899 | US5712124 | US5720936 | US5725871 | US5738868 | US5741516 | US5744311 | US5756353 | US5770219 | US5779708 | US5780045 | US5783208 | US5789655 | US5792451 | US5795587 | US5797898 | US5804212 | US5863736 | WO1987US00880 | WO1989US01025 |