blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2602258

EP2602258 - N-[5-(Aminosulfonyl)-4-methyl-1,3-thiazol-2-yl]-N-methyl-2-[4-(2-pyridinyl)phenyl]acetamide mesylate monohydrate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AiCuris GmbH & Co. KG
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 475
42117 Wuppertal / DE
[2013/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Dr. Schwab, Wilfried
An den Hainbuchen 12
14542 Werder / DE
02 / Birkmann, Alexander
Heinrich-Heine-Str. 13
42327 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Vögtli, Kurt
Maiacher 32
5273 Oberhofen AG / CH
04 / Haag, Dieter
Schlossstrasse 5
4433 Ramlinsburg BL / CH
05 / Lender, Andreas
Niederradenberg 20
42327 Wuppertal / DE
06 / Grunenberg, Alfons
Gneisenaustr. 15
41539 Dormagen / DE
07 / Keil, Birgit
Sudetenstr. 36
40231 Düsseldorf / DE
08 / Rehse, Joachim
Am Kloster 12
42799 Leichlingen / DE
 [2014/11]
Former [2013/24]01 / Schwab, Wilfried
Burgfeld 23
42551 Velbert / DE
02 / Birkmann, Alexander
Heinrich-Heine-Str. 13
42327 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Vögtli, Kurt
Maiacher 32
5273 Oberhofen AG / CH
04 / Haag, Dieter
Schlossstrasse 5
4433 Ramlinsburg BL / CH
05 / Lender, Andreas
Niederradenberg 20
42327 Wuppertal / DE
06 / Grunenberg, Alfons
Gneisenaustr. 15
41539 Dormagen / DE
07 / Keil, Birgit
Sudetenstr. 36
40231 Düsseldorf / DE
08 / Rehse, Joachim
Am Kloster 12
42799 Leichlingen / DE
Representative(s)Arth, Hans-Lothar
ABK Patent Attorneys
Jasminweg 9
14052 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/24]Arth, Hans-Lothar
ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9
14052 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date13157396.626.09.2012
[2013/24]
Priority number, dateEP2011000782326.09.2011         Original published format: EP 11007823
[2016/33]
Former [2013/24]WO2011EP0782326.09.2011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2602258
Date:12.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2602258
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2602258
Date:28.09.2016
[2016/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2013
ClassificationIPC:C07D417/12
[2013/24]
CPC:
C07D417/12 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US); A61K31/427 (KR); A61K31/4402 (KR);
A61K31/4436 (RU); A61P31/00 (EP); A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); C07D277/46 (KR);
C07B2200/13 (CN) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/24]
TitleGerman:N-[5-(Aminosulfonyl)-4-methyl-1,3-thiazol-2-yl]-N-methyl-2-[4-(2-pyridinyl)phenyl]acetamidmesylat-Monohydrat[2013/24]
English:N-[5-(Aminosulfonyl)-4-methyl-1,3-thiazol-2-yl]-N-methyl-2-[4-(2-pyridinyl)phenyl]acetamide mesylate monohydrate[2013/24]
French:Monohydrate de mesylate acétamide N-[5-(Aminosulfonyl)-4-méthyl-1,3-thiazol-2-yl]-N-méthyl-2-[4-(2-pyridinyl)phényl][2013/24]
Examination procedure01.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/24]
08.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2014Fee for grant paid
20.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.05.2016Request for correction of the decision to grant filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12762300.7  / EP2598501
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20120762300) is  28.05.2013
Opposition(s)22.12.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09]
22.12.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/32]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
Former [2016/28]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
Former [2016/24]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
Former [2015/36]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
Former [2015/20]CY19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
Former [2014/48]CY19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO0147904  (BAYER AG [DE], et al);
 [AD]WO2006103011  (AICURIS GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al);
by applicantWO0147904
 EP1244641
 WO2006103011
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.