blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2819664

EP2819664 - NEW COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING AMYOTROPHIC LATERAL SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.04.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.05.2018  [2018/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pharnext
11, rue des Peupliers
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/02]For all designated states
Pharnext
11 Rue des Peupliers
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / COHEN, Daniel
7 bis rue Lelégard
92210 Saint Cloud / FR
02 / NABIROCHKIN, Serguei
49 avenue de Sully Prud'homme
92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR
03 / CHUMAKOV, Ilya
691 rue de la Noue
77000 Vaux Le Penil / FR
04 / HAJJ, Rodolphe
1 bis rue Raymond Greban
78100 St Germain En Laye / FR
 [2017/22]
Former [2015/02]01 / COHEN, Daniel
61 avenue des Courlis
78110 Le Vésinet / FR
02 / NABIROCHKIN, Serguei
49 avenue de Sully Prud'homme
92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR
03 / CHUMAKOV, Ilya
691 rue de la Noue
77000 Vaux Le Penil / FR
04 / HAJJ, Rodolphe
1 bis rue Raymond Greban
78100 St Germain En Laye / FR
Representative(s)Becker, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Becker & Associés
25 Rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/22]Becker, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Becker & Associés
25 rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
Former [2015/02]Becker, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Becker & Associés
25, rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date13706548.828.02.2013
[2017/22]
WO2013EP54024
Priority number, dateWO2012EP5356501.03.2012         Original published format: PCT/EP2012/053565
WO2012EP5357001.03.2012         Original published format: PCT/EP2012/053570
[2015/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013127917
Date:06.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819664
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819664
Date:31.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.09.2013
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/138, A61P25/00, A61K31/137, A61K31/185, A61K31/195, A61K31/42, A61K31/44, A61P29/00
[2015/02]
CPC:
A61K31/185 (EP); A61K31/137 (EP); A61K31/138 (EP);
A61K31/197 (EP); A61K31/428 (EP); A61K31/44 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP); A61P21/02 (EP); A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/138, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/185, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/197, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/428, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (EP)
(-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AMYOTROPHER LATERALSKLEROSE[2016/51]
English:NEW COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING AMYOTROPHIC LATERAL SCLEROSIS[2015/02]
French:NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA SCLÉROSE LATÉRALE AMYOTROPHIQUE[2016/51]
Former [2015/02]NEUE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AMYOTROPHER LATERALSKLEROSE
Former [2015/02]NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS DESTINÉES AU TRAITEMENT DE LA SCLÉROSE LATÉRALE AMYOTROPHIQUE
Entry into regional phase15.09.2014National basic fee paid 
15.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
15.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.04.2017Fee for grant paid
04.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
25.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17173296.9  / EP3235498
EP18157222.3  / EP3348261
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2015
Opposition(s)01.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XDI]WO2009133141  (PHARNEXT [FR], et al);
 [XDI]WO2009133142  (PHARNEXT [FR], et al);
 [XDI]WO2009133128  (PHARNEXT [FR], et al);
 [AP]WO2012117075  (PHARNEXT [FR], et al);
 [XPI]WO2012117073  (PHARNEXT [FR], et al)
by applicantWO03077902
 WO2005066122
 WO2008086492
 WO2009033069
 WO2009033061
 WO2009033054
 WO2009033079
 US2009069419
 US2009076147
 US2009082464
 US2009082440
 US2009099253
 WO2009052191
 WO2009061934
 WO2009068668
 US2009197958
 WO2009096985
 US2009216037
 WO2009133128
 WO2009133141
 WO2009133142
 WO2009153291
 WO2010102071
 WO2010120370
 US2011021571
 WO2011054759
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.