EP2820042 - IGG STIMULATED REMYELINATION OF PERIPHERAL NERVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxalta GmbH Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | For all designated states Baxalta Incorporated 1200 Lakeside Drive Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US | [2020/17] |
Former [2017/47] | For all designated states Baxalta GmbH Zählerweg 4 6300 Zug / CH | ||
For all designated states Baxalta Incorporated 1200 Lakeside Drive Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US | |||
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Baxalta GmbH Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark, Opfikon / CH | ||
For all designated states Baxalta Incorporated 1200 Lakeside Drive Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US | |||
Former [2015/02] | For all designated states Baxter International Inc One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | ||
For all designated states Baxter Healthcare S.A. Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUERY, Patrick Sperlingsweg 36 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
TZEKOVA, Nevena Uerdinger Strasse 12 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
HARTUNG, Hans-peter Pfitznerstrasse 7 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
HERMANN, Corinna Hofzeile 15/38/8 1190 Vienna / AT | 05 /
REIPERT, Birgit Maria Heinegasse 2 2232 Deutsch-Wagram / AT | 06 /
SCHWARZ, Hans-peter Weimarer Strasse 76 1180 Vienna / AT | 07 /
EHRLICH, Hartmut Dr. Heinrich-Maier Strasse 20/1 1180 Vienna / AT | 08 /
BUNK, Sebastian Aegidigasse 10/18 1060 Vienna / AT | [2015/18] |
Former [2015/02] | 01 /
KUERY, Patrick Sperlingsweg 36 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02 /
TZEKOVA, Nevena Uerdinger Strasse 12 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03 /
HARTUNG, Hans-peter Pfitznerstrasse 7 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04 /
HERMANN, Corinna Anzengrubergasse 5 1050 Vienna / AT | |||
05 /
REIPERT, Birgit Maria Heinegasse 2 2232 Deutsch-Wagram / AT | |||
06 /
SCHWARZ, Hans-peter Weimarer Strasse 76 1180 Vienna / AT | |||
07 /
EHRLICH, Hartmut Dr. Heinrich-Maier Strasse 20/1 1180 Vienna / AT | |||
08 /
BUNK, Sebastian Aegidigasse 10/18 1060 Vienna / AT | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13709675.6 | 28.02.2013 | [2019/30] | WO2013US28350 | Priority number, date | US201261605117P | 29.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261605117 P | [2015/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013130826 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2820042 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2820042 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/06, A61P25/00, A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61K39/00 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
A61K39/39516 (EP,EA,IL,US);
C07K16/06 (EA,IL,US);
C07K16/065 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,EA,IL,US);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/02 (EP,EA,IL,KR);
A61P25/14 (EP,IL);
A61P35/02 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39516, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/02] | C07K16/06, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IGG-STIMULIERTE REMYELINISIERUNG PERIPHERER NERVEN | [2015/02] | English: | IGG STIMULATED REMYELINATION OF PERIPHERAL NERVES | [2015/02] | French: | REMYÉLINISATION STIMULÉE PAR IGG DE NERFS PÉRIPHÉRIQUES | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 15.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2019 | 01.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19180237.0 / EP3590960 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2013 | AL | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | HR | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MK | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | RS | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | SM | 24.07.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | IS | 24.11.2019 | LU | 28.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.02.2013 | |
AL | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
MT | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | HR | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | HR | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 24.07.2019 | |
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | Cited in | by applicant | SE348942 | US4608254 | US4640834 | US4687664 | US4814277 | US5122373 | US5177194 | US5180810 | US5639730 | US5770199 | US5864016 | US5886154 | US6069236 | US6093324 | US6835379 | WO2005073252 | US7186410 | US7553938 | US7854703 | WO2010US36470 | WO2011US38247 |