blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2830593

EP2830593 - RNA FORMULATION FOR IMMUNOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2024Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL
published on 06.11.2024  [2024/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BioNTech RNA Pharmaceuticals GmbH
An der Goldgrube 12
55131 Mainz / DE
For all designated states
TRON - Translationale Onkologie an der Universitätsmedizin der Johannes Gutenberg- Universität Mainz gemeinnützige GmbH
Freiligrathstrasse 12
55131 Mainz / DE
[2017/20]
Former [2017/11]For all designated states
BioNTech RNA Pharmaceuticals GmbH
An der Goldgrube 12
55131 Mainz / DE
For all designated states
TRON - Translationale Onkologie an der Universitätsmedizin der Johannes Gutenberg- Universität Mainz gemeinnützige GmbH
Freiligrathstrasse 12
55131 Mainz / DE
For all designated states
Universitätsmedizin der Johannes Gutenberg-Universität Mainz
Langenbeckstrasse 1
55131 Mainz / DE
Former [2016/39]For all designated states
BioNTech AG
An der Goldgrube 12
55131 Mainz / DE
For all designated states
TRON - Translationale Onkologie an der Universitätsmedizin der Johannes Gutenberg- Universität Mainz gemeinnützige GmbH
Freiligrathstrasse 12
55131 Mainz / DE
For all designated states
Universitätsmedizin der Johannes Gutenberg-Universität Mainz
Langenbeckstrasse 1
55131 Mainz / DE
Former [2015/06]For all designated states
BioNTech AG
An der Goldgrube 12
55131 Mainz / DE
For all designated states
TRON Translationale Onkologie an der Johannes Gutenberg-Universität Mainz Gemeinnützige GmbH
Langenbeckstrasse 1
55131 Mainz / DE
For all designated states
Universitätsmedizin der Johannes Gutenberg-Universität Mainz
Langenbeckstrasse 1
55131 Mainz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SAHIN, Ugur
Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1
55116 Mainz / DE
02 / HAAS, Heinrich
Schaftriebweg 68
55131 Mainz / DE
03 / KREITER, Sebastian
Külbstrasse 16
55131 Mainz / DE
04 / DIKEN, Mustafa
Hindenburgstrasse 11
55118 Mainz / DE
05 / FRITZ, Daniel
Heidelbergerfassgasse 12
55116 Mainz / DE
06 / MENG, Martin
Hölderlinstrasse 4
55131 Mainz / DE
07 / KRANZ, Lena, Mareen
Forsterstrasse 20
55118 Mainz / DE
08 / REUTER, Kerstin
Mühlstrasse 40
64283 Darmstadt / DE
 [2015/06]
Representative(s)Schnappauf, Georg
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[2019/09]
Former [2015/06]Schnappauf, Georg
ZSP Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
Application number, filing date13713356.725.03.2013
[2019/09]
WO2013EP00902
Priority number, dateWO2012EP0131926.03.2012         Original published format: PCT/EP2012/001319
[2015/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013143683
Date:03.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830593
Date:04.02.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2830593
Date:27.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.10.2013
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/127, A61K39/00, A61K48/00
[2015/06]
CPC:
A61K39/0011 (EP,US); A61K48/0025 (EP); A61K9/1272 (EP);
A61K2039/53 (EP); A61K2039/55555 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/06]
Extension statesBA26.09.2014
ME26.09.2014
TitleGerman:RNA FORMULIERUNG FÜR IMMUNTHERAPIEN[2015/06]
English:RNA FORMULATION FOR IMMUNOTHERAPY[2015/06]
French:FORMULATION D'ARN POUR L'IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE[2015/06]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2014National basic fee paid 
26.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/06]
13.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2017
15.09.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.09.2017Observations by third parties
30.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.10.2018
30.10.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
10.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2019Fee for grant paid
17.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18171522.8  / EP3427723
EP20189077.9  / EP3777840
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2016
Opposition(s)28.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2024/45]
Former [2022/31]AL27.02.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5580859  (FELGNER PHILIP L [US], et al);
 [XI]WO2011005799  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al);
 [XYI]US2011311584  (SAHIN UGUR [DE], et al);
 [XYI]WO2012006378  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al);
ExaminationWO2010037539
 WO2013113502
by applicantUS2009004213
otherWO2010037539
 WO2013113502
 EP2830593
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.