blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2827840

EP2827840 - CYCLOSPORIN A-BASED AQUEOUS OPHTHALMIC SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.08.2020  [2020/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Laboratoires THEA
12, rue Louis Blériot, Zone Industrielle du Brézet
63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
[2019/18]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Laboratoires Théa
12, rue Louis Bléroit
Zone Industrielle du Brezet
63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MURIAUX, Emmanuel
4 Rue des Galliens
F-78580 Maule / FR
02 / MERCIER, Fabrice
34 Avenue Léon Blum
F-63000 Clermont-ferrand / FR
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Cabinet Laurent & Charras
Le Contemporain
50 Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date13715338.315.03.2013
[2019/35]
WO2013FR50557
Priority number, dateFR2012005258322.03.2012         Original published format: FR 1252583
US201261614218P22.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261614218 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013140071
Date:26.09.2013
Language:FR
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2827840
Date:28.01.2015
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2827840
Date:28.08.2019
Language:FR
[2019/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationIPC:A61K38/13, A61K9/00, A61K9/08, A61K47/32, A61K47/44, A61K47/38, A61P27/02
[2019/16]
CPC:
A61K38/13 (EP,RU,US); A61K9/08 (EP,RU,US); A61K47/38 (RU,US);
A61K47/14 (RU,US); A61K47/32 (EP,RU,US); A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61P27/00 (EP); A61P27/02 (EP); A61P27/04 (EP);
A61K2121/00 (RU) (-)
Former IPC [2015/05]A61K9/00, A61K9/08, A61K38/13, A61K47/14, A61K47/32, A61K47/38
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBA29.08.2014
ME29.08.2014
TitleGerman:CYCLOSPORIN A-BASIERTE WÄSSRIGE OPTHALMISCHE LÖSUNG[2015/05]
English:CYCLOSPORIN A-BASED AQUEOUS OPHTHALMIC SOLUTION[2015/05]
French:SOLUTION OPHTALMIQUE AQUEUSE A BASE DE CICLOSPORINE A[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2014National basic fee paid 
29.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
12.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2019Fee for grant paid
18.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.12.2017
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[I]WO9323010  (SANDOZ AG [AT], et al);
 [I]EP1142566  (MEDIDOM LAB [CH]);
 [I]US2002173516  (CHEN JIAQI [CN], et al);
 [XI]WO2009046967  (FOVEA PHARMACEUTICALS SA [FR], et al);
 [XI]WO2009058585  (BAUSCH & LOMB [US], et al);
 [I]WO2009088570  (SIRION THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al);
 [ID]WO2009099467  (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al);
by applicantWO2009099467
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.