blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2938615

EP2938615 - IMIDAZOPYRIDAZINE DERIVATIVES AS GABAA RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 22.11.2017  [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Limited
Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
[2015/45]
Inventor(s)01 / OMOTO, Kiyoyuki
c/o Pfizer Limited
Portway Building
Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6GP England / GB
02 / OWEN, Robert McKenzie
c/o Pfizer Limited
Portway Building
Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6GP England / GB
03 / PRYDE, David Cameron
c/o Pfizer Limited
Portway Building
Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6GP England / GB
04 / WATSON, Christine Anne Louise
c/o Pfizer Limited
Ramsgate Road
Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ England / GB
05 / TAKEUCHI, Mifune
c/o Pfizer Limited
Ramsgate Road
Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ England / GB
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
[2015/45]
Application number, filing date13812165.204.12.2013
[2015/45]
WO2013IB60631
Priority number, dateUS201261737157P14.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261737157 P
[2015/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014091368
Date:19.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2938615
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2938615
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.06.2014
ClassificationIPC:C07D487/04, A61K45/06, A61K31/5025, A61P29/00
[2016/23]
CPC:
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,US); A61K31/5025 (EP,US); A61K45/06 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP); A61P25/04 (EP); A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2015/45]C07D487/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Extension statesBA14.07.2015
ME14.07.2015
TitleGerman:IMIDAZOPYRIDAZINDERIVATE ALS GABAA-REZEPTORMODULATOREN[2015/45]
English:IMIDAZOPYRIDAZINE DERIVATIVES AS GABAA RECEPTOR MODULATORS[2015/45]
French:DÉRIVÉS D'IMIDAZOPYRIDAZINE EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS D'UN RÉCEPTEUR GABAA[2015/45]
Entry into regional phase14.07.2015National basic fee paid 
14.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/45]
08.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2016Fee for grant paid
05.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2016
Opposition(s)27.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
[2017/45]
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2005080355  (NEUROGEN CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-14* claims 1, 33 *;
 [A]WO2012004714  (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-18 * * page 26, line 25 - line 26 *
by applicantWO9111172
 WO9402518
 WO9855148
 WO0001697
 WO0035298
 US6106864
 WO0238568
 WO03008418
 WO2008118758
 WO2010079443
    - MIRZA, N.R.; MUNRO, G., DRUG NEWS AND PERSPECTIVES, (2010), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 351 - 360
    - O. ALMARSSON; M. J. ZAWOROTKO, CHEM COMMUN, (2004), vol. 17, pages 1889 - 1896
    - HALEBLIAN, J PHARM SCI, (197508), vol. 64, no. 8, pages 1269 - 1288
    - T HIGUCHI; W STELLA, Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems, ACS SYMPOSIUM SERIES, vol. 14
    - LIANG; CHEN, EXPERT OPINION IN THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, (2001), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 981 - 986
    - H. LIEBERMAN; L. LACHMAN, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Tablets, MARCEL DEKKER, (1980), vol. 1
    - VERMA ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY ON-LINE, (2001), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 1 - 14
    - FINNIN; MORGAN, J PHARM SCI, (199910), vol. 88, no. 10, pages 955 - 958
    - WOOLF; SALTER, SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 288, pages 1765 - 1768
    - LAWRENCE ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2008), vol. 58, pages 15 - 35
    - AZIZ ET AL., DIG DIS, (2009), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 31 - 41
    - DWORKIN, AM J MED, (2009), vol. 122, pages S1 - S2
    - GEBER ET AL., AM J MED, (2009), vol. 122, pages S3 - S12
    - HAANPAA ET AL., AM J MED, (2009), vol. 122, pages S13 - S21
    - WOOLF, J CLIN INVEST, (2010), vol. 120, pages 3742 - 3744
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.