EP2906370 - EXTRUSION PRESS SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manchester Copper Products, LLC 435 Gus Hipp Boulevard Rockledge, FL 32955 / US | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEWART, Charles L. c/o Paul Stewart Estate Administrator 28 Azalea Drive Cocoa Beach, FL 32931 / US | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/34] | Application number, filing date | 13845265.1 | 11.10.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013US64558 | Priority number, date | US201213650977 | 12.10.2012 Original published format: US201213650977 | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014059285 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2906370 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2906370 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B21C25/08, B21C23/08, B21C29/04, B21C31/00, B21C35/04 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
B21C23/212 (EP,US);
B21C23/08 (RU);
B21C25/08 (CN,RU);
B21C23/001 (EP,US);
B21C23/085 (CN,US);
B21C23/211 (US);
B21C23/217 (US);
B21C25/02 (EP,US);
B21C25/04 (EP,US);
B21C29/003 (US);
B21C29/02 (EP,US);
B21C29/04 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B21C31/00 (CN,RU,US);
B21C33/006 (EP,US);
B21C35/023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRANGPRESSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2015/34] | English: | EXTRUSION PRESS SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2015/34] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PRESSE À EXTRUSION | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 07.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20172291.5 / EP3725428 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2019 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.10.2013 | AL | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | MT | 20.05.2020 | RS | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | LU | 11.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | FR | 31.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.10.2013 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MT | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 11.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 11.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 11.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 11.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3455137 (EDGECOMBE DAVID A); | [A]EP0114570 (ALUSUISSE [CH]); | [A]JPH0569034 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP); | [A]JP2005000991 (MIZUNUMA SUSUMU); | [A]JP2009107019 (UNIV OSAKA PREFECTURE) | International search | [A]US5572894 (YANO SADAHIDE [JP]); | [A]US2002029601 (KWOK LAI YEE [CN]); | [X]JP2007130661 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD); | [A]WO2009008819 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE], et al); | [A]US2010064756 (KRAFT FRANK F [US]) |