blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2928463

EP2928463 - LYOPHILIZED PREPARATIONS OF MELPHALAN FLUFENAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.09.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.10.2020  [2020/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oncopeptides AB
Västra Trädgårdsgatan 15
111 53 Stockholm / SE
[2019/47]
Former [2017/44]For all designated states
Oncopeptides AB
Västra Trädgårdsgatan 15
111 53 Stockholm / SE
Former [2015/42]For all designated states
Oncopeptides AB
Fogdevreten 2A
171 65 Solna / SE
Inventor(s)01 / SPIRA, Jack
Näsbyvägen 38
S-135 53 Tyresö / SE
02 / LEHMANN, Fredrik
Kanalvägen 61
SE-191 34 Sollentuna / SE
 [2019/47]
Former [2015/42]01 / SPIRA, Jack
Näsbyvägen 38
S-135 53 Tyresö / SE
02 / LEHMANN, Fredrik
Forsbyvägen 10C
S-741 40 Knivsta / SE
Representative(s)Abel & Imray LLP
Westpoint Building
James Street West
Bath BA1 2DA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/47]Abel & Imray
Westpoint Building
James Street West
Bath BA1 2DA / GB
Former [2015/42]Lundquist, Tomas
Awapatent AB Box 450 86
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date13849763.124.10.2013
[2015/42]
WO2013SE51246
Priority number, dateSE2012005121126.10.2012         Original published format: SE 1251211
US201261719184P26.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261719184 P
[2015/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014065751
Date:01.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2928463
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2928463
Date:20.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE01.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2016
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/216, A61K9/19, A61K47/26, A61P35/00
[2015/42]
CPC:
A61K9/19 (EP,RU,US); A61K38/05 (EP,RU,US); A61J3/02 (RU);
A61K31/223 (EP,US); A61K31/26 (RU); A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/26 (EP,RU,US); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P35/02 (EP);
A61K2121/00 (RU) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LYOPHILISIERTE PRÄPARATE AUS MELPHALAN-FLUFENAMID[2015/42]
English:LYOPHILIZED PREPARATIONS OF MELPHALAN FLUFENAMIDE[2015/42]
French:PRÉPARATIONS LYOPHILISÉES DE MELPHALAN FLUFÉNAMIDE[2015/42]
Entry into regional phase29.04.2015National basic fee paid 
21.08.2015Search fee paid 
29.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/42]
29.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
11.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2015/42]
25.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
13.03.2019Fee for grant paid
13.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.10.2019
07.10.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
07.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
31.10.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)EP19207842.6  / EP3628318
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.11.2018
Opposition(s)21.08.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
21.08.2015Request for further processing filed
21.08.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.09.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2020/42]
Former [2020/32]AL20.11.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0196367  (ONCOPEPTIDES AB [SE], et al);
 [I]CN101584669  (JIANGSU AOSAIKANG PHARMACEUTIC [CN]);
 [A]WO2011078782  (ONCOPEPTIDES AB [SE], et al);
 [XP]WO2012146625  (ONCOPEPTIDES AB [SE], et al)
International search[X]WO0196367  (ONCOPEPTIDES AB [SE], et al);
 [A]CN101584669  (JIANGSU AOSAIKANG PHARMACEUTIC [CN]);
 [XP]WO2012146625  (ONCOPEPTIDES AB [SE], et al);
by applicantWO0196367
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.