blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2732818

EP2732818 - A BIPHENYLSULFONAMIDE ENDOTHELIN AND ANGIOTENSIN II RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST TO TREAT GLOMERULOSCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/21]A diphenylsulfonamide endothelin and angiotensin II receptor agonist to treat glomerulosclerosis
[2016/28]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2018  [2018/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ligand Pharmaceuticals Inc.
3911 Sorrento Valley Boulevard
Suite 110
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2017/40]
Former [2014/21]For all designated states
Ligand Pharmaceuticals Inc.
11085 North Torrey Pines Road Suite 300
San Diego, CA 92037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Zhang, Jinkun
11496 Tree Hollow Lane
San Diego, CA California 92128 / US
02 / Dziewanowska, Zofia E
765 Bonair Place
La Jolla, CA California 92037 / US
03 / Belder, Rene
579 Province Line Road
Hopewell, NJ New Jersey 08525 / US
04 / Henderson, Ian
5220 Fiore Terrace, No. 405
San Diego, CA California 92122 / US
05 / Bogardus, Joseph B
892 Hurricane Road
Keene, NY New York 12942 / US
06 / Zhang, Zhaoying
20 El Dorado Way
Monroe NJ 08831 / US
 [2014/51]
Former [2014/21]01 / Zhang, Jinkun
11496 Tree Hollow Lane
San Diego, CA California 92128 / US
02 / Dziewanowska, Zofia E
765 Bonair Place
La Jolla, CA California 92037 / US
03 / Belder, Rene
579 Province Line Road
Hopewell, NJ New Jersey 08525 / US
04 / Henderson, Ian
5220 Fiore Terrace, No. 405
San Diego, CA California 92122 / US
05 / Bogardus, Joseph B
892 Hurricane Road
Keene, NY New York 12942 / US
06 / Zhang, Zhaoying
1405 Northumberland Way
Monmouth Junction, NJ New Jersey 08852 / US
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
Chapel Quarter
Mount Street
Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/18]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2014/21]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Application number, filing date14155459.229.03.2010
[2014/21]
Priority number, dateUS20090165419P31.03.2009         Original published format: US 165419 P
US20090165447P31.03.2009         Original published format: US 165447 P
[2014/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2732818
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2732818
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2014
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/422, A61P9/12, A61K9/20, A61P13/12, C07D413/12
[2016/28]
CPC:
A61K31/422 (EP,US); A61K9/2013 (EP,US); A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2031 (US); A61K9/2054 (EP,US); A61K9/2059 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP); A61P1/12 (EP); A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP); A61P11/00 (EP); A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP); A61P13/02 (EP); A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP); A61P13/12 (EP); A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP); A61P19/02 (EP); A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP); A61P25/06 (EP); A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP); A61P27/02 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP); A61P7/00 (EP); A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP); A61P9/06 (EP); A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP); A61P9/12 (EP); C07D413/12 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2014/21]A61K31/422, A61P9/12, A61K9/20, A61P13/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/21]
TitleGerman:BIPHENYLSULFONAMIDENDOTHELIN- UND ANGIOTENSIN-II-REZEPTORANTAGONIST ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GLOMERULOSKLEROSE[2016/29]
English:A BIPHENYLSULFONAMIDE ENDOTHELIN AND ANGIOTENSIN II RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST TO TREAT GLOMERULOSCLEROSIS[2016/29]
French:ANTAGONISTE DES RÉCEPTEURS DE L'ENDOTHÉLINE ET DE L'ANGIOTENSINE II À BASE DE BIPHÉNYLSULFONAMIDE POUR TRAITER LA GLOMÉRULOSCLÉROSE[2016/29]
Former [2014/21]Diphenylsulfonamidendothelin- und Angiotensin-II-Rezeptoragonist zur Behandlung von Glomerulosklerose
Former [2014/21]A diphenylsulfonamide endothelin and angiotensin II receptor agonist to treat glomerulosclerosis
Former [2014/21]Agoniste des récepteurs de l'endothéline et de l'angiotensine ii à base de diphénylsulfonamide pour traiter la glomérulosclérose
Examination procedure17.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/21]
21.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2017Fee for grant paid
07.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10759268.5  / EP2413930
Divisional application(s)EP17157697.8  / EP3222277
EP20152292.7  / EP3708163
Opposition(s)06.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]WO0001389  (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]);
 [I]US2002143024  (MURUGESAN NATESAN [US], et al)
by applicantUS5612359
 US6297233
 US6380184
 US6518292
 US6586438
 US7390824
 US7598262
 US19980007938
 US19980013952
 US19990390275
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.