blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2769737

EP2769737 - Combination of an anti-CTLA4 antibody with etoposide for the synergistic treatment of proliferative diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.03.2018  [2018/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[2017/14]
Former [2014/35]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Francis, Y.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 & Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ New Jersey 08543 / US
02 / Jure-Kunkel, Maria
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 & Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ New Jersey 08543 / US
 [2014/35]
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstraße 4
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date14162613.529.10.2009
[2014/35]
Priority number, dateUS20090226910P20.07.2009         Original published format: US 226910 P
US2009046216830.07.2009         Original published format: US 462168
WO2009US5220930.07.2009         Original published format: PCT/US2009/052209
[2014/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2769737
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2769737
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2014
ClassificationIPC:A61K45/06, A61K39/395, A61K31/385, A61K31/506, A61K31/337, C07K16/28, A61K33/24, A61K39/00
[2014/35]
CPC:
A61K31/506 (EP,KR); A61K33/243 (EP,US); A61K31/337 (EP);
A61K31/385 (EP); A61K39/395 (KR); A61K39/39558 (EP);
A61K47/22 (KR); A61K47/26 (KR); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); C07K16/2818 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/385, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/24, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP)
(-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/14]
Former [2014/35]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kombination aus einem Anti-CTLA4-Antikörper mit Etoposide für die synergistische Behandlung proliferativer Erkrankungen[2014/35]
English:Combination of an anti-CTLA4 antibody with etoposide for the synergistic treatment of proliferative diseases[2014/35]
French:Combinaison d'anticorps anti-ctla4 avec etoposide pour le traitement synergique de prolifération[2016/49]
Former [2014/37]Combinaison d'anticorps anti-CTLA4 avec etoposide pour le traitement synergique de prolifération
Examination procedure11.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.11.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
20.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2017Fee for grant paid
27.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09749268.0  / EP2456790
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090749268) is  27.05.2013
Opposition(s)08.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004005318  (DAVIS THOMAS ANDREW [US], et al);
 [XYI]US2005226875  (GOMEZ-NAVARRO JESUS [US], et al);
 [XI]US2007160619  (NICHOL GEOFFREY M [US], et al);
 [XYI]WO2007113648  (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al);
 [X]US2009117132  (READETT DAVID ROBERT JOHN [US], et al);
by applicantWO8605807
 US4676980
 WO8901036
 EP0307434
 EP0367166
 US4946778
 WO9106570
 US5112946
 US5122464
 US5336603
 US5349053
 US5359046
 US5447851
 WO9604388
 US5504102
 US5622929
 WO9733899
 WO9734911
 US5811097
 WO9842752
 US5855887
 US5898031
 WO9923105
 WO9932619
 EP0928290
 US5977318
 US6011029
 US6051227
 WO0037504
 US6107094
 WO0114424
 US6207156
 WO0129058
 US6262094
 EP1144639
 US2002039581
 EP1214945
 US2002086014
 US6506559
 US2003051263
 US2003055020
 US2003056235
 EP1309726
 US6682736
 WO2004009769
 WO2004015130
 WO2004035607
 US2004265839
 US2005100913
 US2005201994
 US6984720
 US2006024798
 US7056704
 US7078196
 US7109003
 US7132281
 EP1212422
 US2007082365
 WO2007067959
 US7282564
 US2008050342
 US2008055443
 US2008081373
 US2008139791
 US7432249
 US7432250
 US2008248576
 US7538095
 US7560438
 US20030395503
 US20050051208
 US20060402502
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.