EP2870888 - An aerosol generating system having means for disabling a consumable part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2025 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GR | published on 19.02.2025 [2025/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2024/27] |
Former [2015/20] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flick, Jean-Marc Rue de la Poste 3 1405 Pomy / CH | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Abitz & Partner, et al Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [2024/27] |
Former [2019/22] | Ponder, William Anthony John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | ||
Former [2015/20] | Ponder, William Anthony John Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14172111.8 | 22.12.2011 | [2015/20] | Priority number, date | EP20100252236 | 24.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10252236 | [2015/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2870888 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2870888 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2870888 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A61L9/03 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
A24F40/53 (EP,EA,US);
A24D3/17 (KR);
A24F47/00 (EA);
A24F40/40 (US);
A24F40/50 (US);
A61L9/037 (EP,US);
B63C9/115 (US);
F41H1/02 (US);
H05B1/02 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2015/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Aerosolerzeugungssystem mit Mitteln zur Deaktivierung eines Verbrauchsmaterialteils | [2015/20] | English: | An aerosol generating system having means for disabling a consumable part | [2015/20] | French: | Système de génération d'aérosol doté de moyens pour désactiver un consommable | [2015/20] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 22.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11811345.5 / EP2654471 | Divisional application(s) | EP19168360.6 / EP3549463 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.02.2020
03.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE JT International S.A. 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH Opponent's representative Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | 02
02.03.2020
04.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Tobacco Limited 121 Winterstoke Road Bristol BS3 2LL / GB Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/22] |
Former [2021/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.02.2020
03.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE JT International S.A. 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH Opponent's representative Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
02
02.03.2020
04.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB Opponent's representative Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
Former [2021/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.02.2020
03.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE JT International S.A. 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH Opponent's representative Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
02
02.03.2020
04.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB Opponent's representative Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
Former [2020/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.02.2020
03.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE JT International S.A. 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH Opponent's representative Gill Jennings & Every LLP PMA The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
02
02.03.2020
04.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB Opponent's representative Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 13.03.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.09.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.10.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 12.01.2022 | Appeal received No. T0066/22 | 12.01.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 14.03.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.05.2023 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2023/19] | 31.10.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 10.01.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 31.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.05.2019 | CY | 29.05.2019 | FI | 29.05.2019 | HR | 29.05.2019 | MC | 29.05.2019 | MK | 29.05.2019 | MT | 29.05.2019 | SM | 29.05.2019 | BG | 29.08.2019 | IS | 29.09.2019 | AT | 22.12.2019 | LT | 22.12.2019 | LU | 22.12.2019 | LV | 22.12.2019 | RS | 22.12.2019 | DK | 31.12.2019 | EE | 31.12.2019 | NO | 31.12.2019 | PT | 21.10.2020 | CZ | 22.12.2020 | IE | 22.12.2020 | SK | 22.12.2020 | TR | 22.12.2020 | HU | 23.12.2020 | SE | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | [2025/08] |
Former [2022/33] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MK | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
AT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
SK | 22.12.2020 | ||
TR | 22.12.2020 | ||
HU | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
BE | 31.12.2020 | ||
GR | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/30] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MK | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
AT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
SK | 22.12.2020 | ||
TR | 22.12.2020 | ||
HU | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
AT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
SK | 22.12.2020 | ||
HU | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
AT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
SK | 22.12.2020 | ||
HU | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
AT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
SK | 22.12.2020 | ||
HU | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
AT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
HU | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
AT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
HU | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
AT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
AT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
AT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
AT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
DK | 31.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
RS | 22.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
EE | 31.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
LT | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
NO | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
LV | 22.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 29.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0358002 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]); | [A]EP0485134 (STEINER CO INC [US]); | [Y]US2002105099 (WARREN JACQUELINE M COLE [US]); | [A]US2007074734 (BRAUNSHTEYN MICHAEL S [US], et al); | [XY]US2010163063 (FERNANDO FELIX [GB], et al) | by applicant | WO2007078273 | Opposition | GB2262452 | GB2263068 | WO9501137 | EP1211628 | WO2005025654 | WO2005120614 | WO2010045671 | US7779831 | EP0358002 | US5060671 | US5095921 | EP0485134 | US5144962 | US6234167 | US6312072 | JP2002165882 | US2002105099 | US6501052 | JP2003290356 | US6766220 | US2007008121 | US2007074734 | WO2007078273 | WO2007136795 | WO2009086780 | US2011226236 | EP2399636 | WO2012027350 | EP2468117 | EP2468116 |