blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2801625

EP2801625 - Molecular genetic approach to treatment and diagnosis of alcohol and drug dependence [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 08.07.2020  [2020/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Virginia Patent Foundation
250 West Main Street, Suite 300
Charlottesville, VA 22902 / US
[2017/39]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
University Of Virginia
Patent Foundation 250 West Main Street Suite 300
Charlottesville, Virginia 22902 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Johnson, Bankole A.
2857 Carters Mountain Road
Charlottesville, VA 22902 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Lee, Nicholas John, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/44]Hart, Deborah Mary
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Former [2014/46]Hart, Deborah Mary
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14173142.201.07.2011
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateUS20100361203P02.07.2010         Original published format: US 361203 P
US201161429416P03.01.2011         Original published format: US 201161429416 P
US201161488328P20.05.2011         Original published format: US 201161488328 P
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801625
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801625
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2014
ClassificationIPC:C12Q1/68
[2014/46]
CPC:
A61K31/4178 (EP,IL,US); C12Q1/6883 (EP,IL,US); A61K31/7048 (EP,IL,US);
A61P25/30 (EP,IL); A61P25/32 (EP,IL); A61P25/34 (EP,IL);
A61P25/36 (EP,IL); C12Q1/6888 (IL,US); G16B20/00 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,IL,US); C12Q2600/156 (US); C12Q2600/172 (EP,IL,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2014/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Molekularer genetischer Ansatz zur Behandlung und Diagnose von Alkohol- und Drogenabhängigkeit[2014/46]
English:Molecular genetic approach to treatment and diagnosis of alcohol and drug dependence[2014/46]
French:Approche génétique moléculaire pour le traitement et le diagnostic de dépendance à l'alcool et aux drogues[2014/46]
Examination procedure11.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
13.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
13.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2017Fee for grant paid
19.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11801503.1  / EP2588630
Opposition(s)02.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE01.11.2017
PT01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
TR01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
MT01.07.2018
[2020/28]
Former [2020/16]EE01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
TR01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
MT01.07.2018
Former [2020/08]EE01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
MT01.07.2018
Former [2018/37]EE01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
Former [2018/25]RS01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO03097873  (EPIDAUROS BIOTECHNOLOGIE AG [DE], et al);
 [Y]WO03100091  (EPIDAUROS BIOTECHNOLOGIE AG [DE], et al);
 [A]WO2009108837  (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al);
by applicantUS4160452
 US4256108
 US4265874
 WO0016750
 WO0057858
 US6323236
 US2006173064
 US2007275970
 WO2007US88100
 WO2008US52628
 WO2008US64232
 WO2009US35420
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.