blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2815762

EP2815762 - CONJUGATION PROCESS OF BACTERIAL POLYSACCHARIDES TO CARRIER PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/52]Conjugation process of bacterial polysaccharides to carrier proteins
[2015/13]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
Rue de l'Institut, 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[2017/22]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
rue de l'Institut, 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Biemans, Ralph Leon
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a.
Rue de l'Institut 89
B-1330 Rixensart / BE
02 / Duvivier, Pierre
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a.
Rue de l'Institut 89
B-1330 Rixensart / BE
03 / Gavard, Olivier Francis Nicolas
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a.
Rue de l'Institut 89
B-1330 Rixensart / BE
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Baker, Suzanne J.
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date14181075.407.03.2011
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateGB2010000392209.03.2010         Original published format: GB 201003922
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2815762
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2815762
Date:25.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815762
Date:31.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2015
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/02
[2014/52]
CPC:
A61K47/61 (EP,US); A61K39/02 (KR); A61K31/70 (KR);
A61K39/092 (EP,US); A61K47/50 (KR); A61K47/6415 (EP,US);
A61K47/646 (EP,US); A61P31/04 (EP); A61P31/16 (EP);
A61K2039/6037 (EP,US); A61K2039/62 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBA14.08.2014
ME14.08.2014
TitleGerman:Konjugationsverfahren für bakterielle Polysaccharide an Trägerproteine[2017/10]
English:CONJUGATION PROCESS OF BACTERIAL POLYSACCHARIDES TO CARRIER PROTEINS[2015/13]
French:Procédé de conjugaison de polysaccharides bactériens à protéines porteuses[2017/10]
Former [2014/52]Konjugationsverfahren für bakterielle Polysaccharide an Trägerproteine
Former [2014/52]Conjugation process of bacterial polysaccharides to carrier proteins
Former [2014/52]Procédé de conjugaison de polysaccharides bactériens à protéines porteuses
Examination procedure14.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
25.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2017Fee for grant paid
20.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11709065.4  / EP2544708
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.02.2018  24.05.2019  WITHDRAWN
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
One Merck Drive
Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  28.02.2018  19.11.2019  WITHDRAWN
Sanofi Pasteur Inc./Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH/Sanofi Winthrop Industries S.A.
1 Discovery Drive/Brüningstr. 50/
20 Avenue Raymond Aron
Swiftwater PA 18370/65926 Frankfurt am Main/
92160 Antony / US
Opponent's representative
Zwicker, Jörk, et al, et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
 03  28.02.2018  19.11.2019  WITHDRAWN
SK Chemicals Co., Ltd.
310, Pangyo-ro, Budang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR
Opponent's representative
Zwicker, Jörk, et al, et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
 [2019/52]
Former [2019/27]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2018  24.05.2019  WITHDRAWN
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
One Merck Drive
Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  28.02.2018  13.03.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Sanofi Pasteur Inc./Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH/Sanofi Winthrop Industries S.A.
1 Discovery Drive/Brüningstr. 50/
20 Avenue Raymond Aron
Swiftwater PA 18370/65926 Frankfurt am Main/
92160 Antony / US
Opponent's representative
Zwicker, Jörk, et al, et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
 03  28.02.2018  13.03.2018  ADMISSIBLE
SK Chemicals Co., Ltd.
310, Pangyo-ro, Budang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR
Opponent's representative
Zwicker, Jörk, et al, et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
Former [2018/15]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2018  01.03.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
One Merck Drive
Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  28.02.2018    WITHDRAWN
Sanofi Pasteur Inc./Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH/Sanofi Winthrop Industries S.A.
1 Discovery Drive/Brüningstr. 50/
20 Avenue Raymond Aron
Swiftwater PA 18370/65926 Frankfurt am Main/
92160 Antony / US
Opponent's representative
Zwicker, Jörk, et al, et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
 03  28.02.2018    WITHDRAWN
SK Chemicals Co., Ltd.
310, Pangyo-ro, Budang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR
Opponent's representative
Zwicker, Jörk, et al, et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
Former [2018/14]
Opponent(s)01  26.02.2018  01.03.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
One Merck Drive
Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
16.03.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.09.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.11.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2019
20.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2019Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
06.12.2019Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2020/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
MK31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
[2020/34]
Former [2020/31]MC31.05.2017
MK31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
Former [2018/52]MC31.05.2017
RS31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
Former [2018/13]RS31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
Former [2017/52]RS31.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4356170  (JENNINGS HAROLD J, et al) [Y] 1-3,9-12 * column 3, paragraph 3 *;
 [Y]WO2006082530  (CHIRON SRL [IT], et al) [Y] 1-3,9-12 * pages 2,7-11; figures 1,2,6-8; claims 1,2,18-26 *;
 [Y]WO2007000322  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [Y] 1-3,9-12 * pages 3,14; claims 9,26-33,41-53 *;
 [Y]WO2007071707  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [Y] 9-11* page 18 - page 23; examples 6-14; claims 22,89,93,94,134,136 *;
 [Y]US2007184071  (HAUSDORFF WILLIAM P [BE], et al) [Y] 1-3,9-12 * paragraph [0196] - paragraph [0232] * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0246] *;
 [Y]  - ANDERSON ET AL, "Vaccines consisting of periodate-cleaved oligosaccharides from the capsule of Haemophilus influenzae type b coupled to a protein carrier: structural and temporal requirements for priming in the human infant.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (19860801), vol. 137, no. 4, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1181 - 1186, XP055007229 [Y] 1-3,9-12 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - KIM J S ET AL, "Monitoring activation sites on polysaccharides by GC-MS", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, vol. 358, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.AB.2006.08.016, ISSN 0003-2697, (20061101), pages 136 - 142, (20061101), XP024942320 [Y] 1-3,9-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2006.08.016
 [Y]  - STEINHOFF M C ET AL, "A RANDOMIZED COMPARISON OF THREE BIVALENT STREPTOCOCCUS PNEUMONIAE GLYCOPROTEIN CONJUGATE VACCINES IN YOUNG CHILDREN: EFFECT OF POLYSACCHARIDE SIZE AND LINKAGE CHARACTERISTICS", THE PEDIATRIC INFECTIOUS DISEASE JOURNAL, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (19940501), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1097/00006454-199405000-00007, ISSN 0891-3668, pages 368 - 372, XP000600692 [Y] 1-3,9-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006454-199405000-00007
by applicantUS4057685
 US4235877
 US4365170
 US4459286
 EP0161188
 US4596556
 EP0208375
 US4673574
 US4709017
 EP0281673
 US4790824
 US4808700
 EP0372501
 US4940460
 US4941880
 EP0378881
 US4950740
 WO9101146
 EP0427347
 US5064413
 EP0471177
 EP0477508
 EP0497524
 EP0497525
 WO9303761
 WO9315760
 WO9317712
 WO9403208
 WO9405325
 EP0594610
 US5312335
 US5334144
 US5339163
 US5383851
 WO9508348
 US5466220
 US5480381
 US5503627
 US5520639
 WO9629094
 US5569189
 WO9634960
 WO9701638
 US5599302
 WO9713785
 WO9713537
 US5649912
 WO9732980
 WO9737705
 WO9741731
 WO9748440
 US5704911
 WO9818930
 WO9820734
 US5766608
 WO9828037
 US5843711
 US5843464
 WO9855606
 WO9858668
 US5893397
 WO9927961
 US5917017
 WO9934850
 US5993412
 WO9964067
 WO0010599
 WO0037105
 WO0056360
 WO0061761
 WO0113977
 EP1092444
 WO0172337
 WO0209746
 US6455673
 WO02091998
 WO2006067632
 US2007184072
    - CHU C. ET AL., INFECT. IMMUNITY, (1983), page 245 256
    - SHOUSUN CHEN SZU ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 152, pages 7 - 20
    - UCHIDA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1973), vol. 218, pages 3838 - 3844
    - KUO ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (1995), vol. 63, pages 2706 - 13
    - FALUGI ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 31, pages 3816 - 3824
    - BARALDOI ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (2004), vol. 72, pages 4884 - 7
    - GEVER ET AL., MED. MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL., (1979), vol. 165, pages 171 - 288
    - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (200506), vol. 46, pages 4479 - 4482
    - HELMINEN ME ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1993), vol. 61, pages 2003 - 2010
OppositionUS4902506
 US5565204
 US5623057
 WO9831393
 WO0222168
 WO2004043376
 WO2005014037
 US2007184071
 US2007184072
 WO2009000825
 US4356170
 WO9405325
 WO9605859
 US2004213803
 EP1625850
 WO2006082530
 WO2007000322
 US2007141084
 WO2007071707
 WO2008157590
 EP2815762
    - ANDERSON et al., "Vaccines consisting of periodate-cleaved oligosaccharides from the capsule of Haemophilus influenzae type b coupled to a protein carrier: structural and temporal requirements for priming in the human infant", The Journal of Immunology, (19860815), vol. 137, no. 4, pages 1181 - 1186, XP055007229
    - "Creating Specific Functionalities", HERMANSON, Bioconjugate Techniques, (20080000), pages 129 - 131, XP055467625
    - KIM et al., "Monitoring activation sites on polysaccharides by GC-MS", Analytical Biochemistry, (20060830), vol. 358, pages 136 - 142, XP005694532

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2006.08.016
    - "product information", Excerpt of 'PDR, (19900207), pages 880-881 - ,1431-1432, XP055467629
    - FRASCH, "Preparation of bacterial polysaccharide-protein conjugates: Analytical and manufacturing challenges", Vaccine, (20090624), vol. 27, no. 46, pages 6468 - 6470, XP026704485

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.06.013
    - "chapter 11 conjugation chemistry", LEES et al., Pneumococcal Vaccines: the Impact of Conjugate Vaccine, (20080000), pages 163 - 174, XP055467636
    - KUO et al., "Characterization of a recombinant pneumolysin and its use as a protein carrier for pneumococcal type 18C conjugate vaccines", Infect Immun, (19950000), vol. 63, pages 2706 - 2713, XP055033057
    - "Sigma catalogue", Biochemicals and Reagents, For Life Science Research, (20000000), page 781, XP055467643
    - "product information", PDR 63, (20081118), pages 3241 - 3247, XP055467646
    - LEE, "Quality Control of Polyvalent Pneumococcal Polysaccharide-Protein Conjugate Vaccine by Nephelometry", The International Association for Biologicals, (20020000), vol. 63, pages 97 - 103, XP002330498

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/biol.2001.0320
    - ANDERSON et al., "Vaccines consisting of periodate-cleaved oligosaccharides from the capsule of Haemophilus influenzae type b coupled to a protein carrier: structural and temporal requirements for priming in the human infant", J. of Immunol., (19860815), vol. 137, no. 4, pages 1181 - 1186, XP055007229
    - KIM J.S., "Monitoring activation sites on polysaccharides by GC-MS", Analytical Biochemistry, New York, (20060830), vol. 358, no. 1, pages 136 - 142, XP005694532

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2006.08.016
    - STEINHOFF, M.C. et al., "A randomized comparison of three bivalent Streptococcus pneumoniae glycoprotein conjugate vaccines in young children: effect of polysaccharide size and linkage characteristics", Pediatric Inf. Disease J., (19940501), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 368 - 372, XP000600692

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006454-199405000-00007
    - PEETERS, CC et al., "Preparation of polysaccharide-conjugate vaccines", PEETERS, CC et al., Robinson A., Hudson M.J., Cranage M.P., Vaccine Protocols. Methods in Molecular Medicine?, Humana Press, (20030201), vol. 87, pages 153 - 173, ISBN 978-1-58829-140-0, XP002310929

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/1-59259-399-2:153
    - FRASCH C.E, "Preparation of bacterial polysaccharide-protein conjugates: Analytical and manufacturing challenges", Vaccine, (20091030), vol. 27, no. 46, pages 6468 - 6470, XP026704485

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.06.013
    - LAFERRIERE, C.A. et al., "The synthesis of Streptococcus pneumoniae polysaccharide-tetanus toxoid conjugates and the effect of chain length on immunogenicity", Vaccine, (19971102), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 179 - 186, XP002301344

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(96)00148-X
    - LEE, C.J., "Quality control of polyvalent pneumococcal polysaccharide-protein conjugate vaccine by nephelometry", Biologicals, (20020600), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 97 - 103, XP002330498

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/biol.2001.0320
    - RICHARDS, J.C. et al., "Structure of the specific capsular polysaccharide of Streptococcus pneumoniae type 23F (American type 23)", Biochem Cell Biol, (19880700), vol. 66, pages 758 - 771, XP009155178

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/o88-087
    - ANDERSON, P.W. et al., "Effect of oligosaccharide chain length, exposed terminal group, and hapten loading on the antibody response of human adults and infants to vaccines consisting of Haemophilus influenzae type b capsular antigen unterminally coupled to the diphtheria protein CRM197.", J Immunol, (19890401), vol. 142, no. 7, pages 2464 - 2468, XP002913714
    - "1. Functional Targets", HERMANSON, G.T., Bioconjugate Techniques, Academic Press, Inc, pages 114 - 116, XP055470232
    - KIM J.S., "Monitoring activation sites on polysaccharides by GC-MS", Analytical Biochemistry, New York, (20060830), vol. 358, no. 1, pages 136 - 142, XP024942320

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2006.08.016
    - PEETERS, CC et al., "Preparation of polysaccharide-conjugate vaccines", Methods in Molecular Medicine?, (20030200), vol. 87, pages 153 - 173, XP002310929

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/1-59259-399-2:153
    - FRASCH C.E, "Preparation of bacterial polysaccharide-protein conjugates: Analytical and manufacturing challenges", Vaccine, (20090624), vol. 27, no. 46, pages 6468 - 6470, XP026704485

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.06.013
    - LEE, C.J., "Quality control of polyvalent pneumococcal polysaccharide-protein conjugate vaccine by nephelometry", Biologicals, (20020600), vol. 30, pages 97 - 103, XP002330498

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/biol.2001.0320
    - RICHARDS, J.C. et al., "Structure of the specific capsular polysaccharide of Streptococcus pneumoniae type 23F (American type 23)", Biochem Cell Biol, (19880700), vol. 66, no. 7, pages 758 - 771, XP009155178

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/o88-087
    - ANDERSON, P.W. et al., "Effect of oligosaccharide chain length, exposed terminal group, and hapten loading on the antibody response of human adults and infants to vaccines consisting of Haemophilus influenzae type b capsular antigen unterminally coupled to the diphtheria protein CRM197.", J Immunol, (19890407), vol. 142, pages 2464 - 2468, XP002913714
    - "1. Functional Targets", HERMANSON, G.T., Bioconjugate Techniques, Academic Press, Inc, (19960108), pages 114 - 116, XP055470232
    - Anonymous, "The Effect of Temperature on Rate of Reaction", LibreTexts Chemistry, pages 1 - 2, URL: https://chem.libretexts.org/Bookshelves/Physical_and_Theoretical_Chemistry_Textbook_Maps/Supplemental_Modules_(Physical_and_Theoretical_Chemistry)/Kinetics/Rate_Laws/Reaction_Mechanisms/Reaction_Mechanisms/The_Effect_of_Temperature_on_Rate_of_Reaction, XP055642431
    - KRISTIANSEN et al., "Periodate oxidation of polysaccharides for modification of chemical and physical properties", Carbohydrate Res., (20100000), vol. 345, no. 10, pages 1264 - 1271, XP027118778
    - Anonymous, "Room temperature", Wikipedia, (20190810), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://en.wikipedia.ortz/wiki/Room_ temperature, XP055642435
    - Anonymous, "Biological Buffers", AppliChem, (20080000), pages 1 - 20, XP055591620
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.