blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2864359

EP2864359 - ANTI-CD26 ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.2020
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.04.2020  [2020/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADIENNE S.A.
Via Zurigo, 46
6900 Lugano / CH
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / DI NARO, Antonio Francesco
Via San Bartolomee
CH-6922 Morcote / CH
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[2019/17]
Former [2015/18]Andrae | Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstraße 2
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14705767.319.02.2014
[2019/17]
WO2014EP53243
Priority number, dateEP2013042502919.02.2013         Original published format: EP 13425029
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014128168
Date:28.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2864359
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2864359
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2014
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/28, A61P37/06
[2015/18]
CPC:
C07K16/2896 (EP,KR,RU,US); A61K39/3955 (RU,US); A61P37/06 (EP,US);
A61P7/06 (EP,US); C07K16/40 (RU,US); A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,KR,US); C07K2317/24 (US); C07K2317/33 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/34 (US); C07K2317/565 (US); C07K2317/76 (US);
C07K2317/92 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Extension statesBA04.02.2015
ME04.02.2015
TitleGerman:ANTI-CD26-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2015/18]
English:ANTI-CD26 ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF[2015/18]
French:ANTICORPS ANTI-CD26 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2019/04]
Former [2015/18]ANTICORPS ANTI-CD-26 ET APPLICATIONS ASSOCIÉES
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase26.01.2015National basic fee paid 
26.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
09.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.12.2018
17.12.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2019Fee for grant paid
12.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19170670.4  / EP3536711
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.06.2016
Opposition(s)27.01.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1179542  (EUROGENETICS NV [BE], et al);
 [Y]WO02092127  (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al);
 [XDY]WO2007014169  (Y S THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007060528  (CHRISTOPHER RONALD J [US], et al);
by applicantUS4036945
 US4331647
 US4683195
 US4704692
 US4946778
 EP0404097
 WO9311161
 US5229275
 US5545806
 US5545807
 US5567610
 US5633425
 US5661016
 EP1241179
 WO2007014169
 US2010196266
 US7863239
 US7972993
 US7982013
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.