EP2981967 - MAGNETIC FIELD PLASMA CONFINEMENT FOR COMPACT FUSION POWER REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, Maryland 20817 / US | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGUIRE, Thomas, John 2726 Bouquet Lane Palmdale, CA 93551 / US | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/06] | Application number, filing date | 14729118.1 | 03.04.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014US32757 | Priority number, date | US201361808122P | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808122 P | US201361808089P | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808089 P | US201361807932P | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361807932 P | US201361808110P | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808110 P | US201361808101P | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808101 P | US201361808136P | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808136 P | US201361808154P | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808154 P | US201361808066P | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808066 P | US201361808093P | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808093 P | US201361808131P | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808131 P | US201414242999 | 02.04.2014 Original published format: US201414242999 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014165641 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981967 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2981967 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G21B1/05, H05H1/14 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
G21B1/05 (EP,IL,US);
G21B1/052 (EP,US);
H05H1/14 (EP,IL,US);
Y02E30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETFELDPLASMABEGRENZUNG FÜR EINEN KOMPAKTEN FUSIONSENERGIEREAKTOR | [2016/06] | English: | MAGNETIC FIELD PLASMA CONFINEMENT FOR COMPACT FUSION POWER REACTOR | [2016/06] | French: | CONFINEMENT DE PLASMA PAR CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE POUR REACTEUR DE FUSION COMPACTE | [2017/10] |
Former [2016/06] | CONFINEMENT DE PLASMA À CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE POUR ÉNERGIE DE FUSION COMPACTE | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 30.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2014 | AL | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | CZ | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | HR | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | MK | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | RS | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | SM | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | IE | 03.04.2018 | LU | 03.04.2018 | MT | 03.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 03.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 03.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
MT | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 03.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 03.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
MT | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 03.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
MT | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 03.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
MT | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 03.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | HR | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | HR | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4252608 (BALDWIN DAVID E, et al) [A] 1,6,14 * column 10, line 54 - column 11, line 54 * * column 3, line 24 - line 64; figures 6,7 *; | [A] - Bromberg et al., "Innovative design options for internal coils", vol. PFC/JA-90-42, (199010), pages 1 - 8, Ninth Topical Meeting on the Technology of Fusion Energy, Oak Brook, Illinois, October 7-11, 1990, URL: http://www.psfc.mit.edu/library1/catalog/reports/1990/90ja/90ja042/90ja042_full.pdf, (20140718), XP002727474 [A] 1,6,14 * page 1, column l, paragraphs 1-3 * | [A] - IMAZAWA ET AL., "Spherical tokamak generation and merging on UTST using ex-vessel poloidal field coils only", ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING IN JAPAN, USA, (201206), vol. 179, no. 4, doi:10.1002/eej.21254, ISSN 0424-7760, pages 18 - 24, XP002727492 [A] 1,6,14 * page 18, paragraph 1 - paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eej.21254 | [A] - Cohn et al., "Advantages of High Field Tokamaks for Fusion reactor Development", Cambridge, MA, USA, vol. PFC/JA-85-39, (198512), pages 1 - 23, Plasma Fusion center - MIT, URL: http://www.psfc.mit.edu/library1/catalog/reports/1980/85ja/85ja039/85ja039_full.pdf, (20140718), XP002727475 [A] 1,6,14 * page 9, paragraph 3 * |