EP2970493 - METHODS FOR ACHIEVING THERAPEUTICALLY EFFECTIVE DOSES OF ANTI-CD47 AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, 3rd Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLINGHAM, Stephen 265 Campus Drive Stanford, California 94305 / US | 02 /
HOWARD, Maureen Stanford University The Institute for Stem Cell Biology and Regenerative Medicine 265 Campus Drive, 3rd Floor Stanford, CA 94305 / US | 03 /
LIU, Jie 3119 Stockton Place Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 04 /
MAJETI, Ravindra Stanford Institute for Stem Cell Bio and Regenerative Medicine 1050 Arastradero Road Building A Stanford, California 94304 / US | 05 /
PROHASKA, Susan Sweeney 725 Mariposa Avenue No 207 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 06 /
VOLKMER, Anne K. 265 Campus Drive Stanford, CA 94305 / US | 07 /
VOLKMER, Jens-Peter 265 Campus Drive Stanford, CA 94305 / US | 08 /
WEISSMAN, Irving L. 747 Santa Ynez Street Stanford, CA 94305 / US | [2016/11] |
Former [2016/08] | 01 /
WILLINGHAM, Stephen 265 Campus Drive Stanford, California 94305 / US | ||
02 /
HOWARD, Maureen Stanford University The Institute for Stem Cell Biology and Regenerative Medicine 265 Campus Drive, 3rd Floor Stanford, CA 94305 / US | |||
03 /
LIU, Jie 3119 Stockton Place Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
04 /
MAJETI, Ravindra Stanford Institute for Stem Cell Bio and Regenerative Medicine 1050 Arastradero Road Building A Stanford, California 94304 / US | |||
05 /
PROHASKA, Susan 725 Mariposa Avenue No 207 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | |||
06 /
VOLKMER, Anne K. 265 Campus Drive Stanford, CA 94305 / US | |||
07 /
VOLKMER, Jens-Peter 265 Campus Drive Stanford, CA 94305 / US | |||
08 /
WEISSMAN, Irving L. 747 Santa Ynez Street Stanford, CA 94305 / US | |||
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
WILLINGHAM, Stephen 265 Campus Drive Stanford, California 94305 / US | ||
02 /
HOWARD, Maureen / US | |||
03 /
LIU, Jie 3119 Stockton Place Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
04 /
MAJETI, Ravindra Stanford Institute for Stem Cell Bio and Regenerative Medicine 1050 Arastradero Road Building A Stanford, California 94304 / US | |||
05 /
PROHASKA, Susan 725 Mariposa Avenue No 207 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | |||
06 /
VOLKMER, Anne K. 265 Campus Drive Stanford, CA 94305 / US | |||
07 /
VOLKMER, Jens-Peter 265 Campus Drive Stanford, CA 94305 / US | |||
08 /
WEISSMAN, Irving L. 747 Santa Ynez Street Stanford, CA 94305 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Chapman, Desmond Mark Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14768797.4 | 26.02.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US18743 | Priority number, date | US201361800102P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361800102 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014149477 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2970493 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2970493 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K38/18 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
A61K38/1774 (EP,US);
A61K38/1816 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZIELUNG THERAPEUTISCH WIRKSAMER DOSIERUNGEN VON ANTI-CD47-MITTELN | [2016/03] | English: | METHODS FOR ACHIEVING THERAPEUTICALLY EFFECTIVE DOSES OF ANTI-CD47 AGENTS | [2016/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'OBTENTION DE DOSES THÉRAPEUTIQUEMENT EFFICACES D'AGENTS ANTI-CD47 | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 28.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19166334.3 / EP3536709 | EP20201319.9 / EP3792285 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.01.2020
07.01.2020
ADMISSIBLE König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Strasse 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Düsseldorf, et al, et al Mönchenwerther Straße 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
03.01.2020
07.01.2020
ADMISSIBLE Genmab A/S Kalvebod Brygge 43 1560 Copenhagen V / DK Opponent's representative J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/42] |
Former [2022/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.01.2020
07.01.2020
ADMISSIBLE König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Strasse 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Düsseldorf, et al, et al Mönchenwerter Straße 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
03.01.2020
07.01.2020
ADMISSIBLE Genmab A/S Kalvebod Brygge 43 1560 Copenhagen V / DK Opponent's representative J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | |||
Former [2020/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.01.2020
07.01.2020
ADMISSIBLE König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Strasse 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative König, Gregor Sebastian, et al, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Straße 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
03.01.2020
07.01.2020
ADMISSIBLE Genmab A/S Kalvebod Brygge 43 1560 Copenhagen V / DK Opponent's representative J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | 20.01.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.06.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.10.2021 | 21.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.09.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 28.01.2022 | Appeal received No. T0235/22 | 28.01.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 23.05.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.06.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 15.07.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2014 | AL | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | PL | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | RS | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | SM | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 26.02.2014 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 03.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | US2014140989 [ ] (ECKELMAN BRENDAN [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2007113297 (YANG YONGGUANG [US], et al); | [Y]US2010239578 (DANSKA JAYNE [CA], et al); | [Y]US2010323949 (LUE AIFENG [CN], et al); | [Y]WO2011143624 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al); | [X]US2012282174 (WEISSMAN IRVING L [US], et al); | [XP]WO2013109752 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | by applicant | US2010239579 | US2011014119 | WO2011143624 | US2012282174 | WO2013109752 | Opposition | WO2011143624 | WO2014108483 |