EP2981272 - MICROPOROUS ZIRCONIUM SILICATE AND DIURETICS FOR THE REDUCTION OF POTASSIUM AND TREATMENT OF CHRONIC KIDNEY AND/OR CHRONIC HEART DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2025 | New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZS Pharma, Inc 508 Wrangler Dr., Suite 100 Coppell, TX 75019 / US | [2023/09] |
Former [2016/06] | For all designated states ZS Pharma, Inc 508 Wrangler Dr., Suite 100 Coppell, TX 75019-7609 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEYSER, Donald Jeffrey 1216 Wyndham Hill Lane Southlake, Texas 76092 / US | 02 /
GUILLEM, Alvaro F. 727 Lathrop Street Lantana, Texas 76226 / US | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Eastbrook House Shaftesbury Road Cambridge CB2 8BF / GB | ||
Former [2016/06] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14779186.7 | 03.04.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014US32815 | Priority number, date | US201361808897P | 05.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808897 P | US201361914362P | 10.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361914362 P | US201461930331P | 22.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461930331 P | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014165670 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981272 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2981272 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/585, A61K31/495, A61K31/519, A61P5/40, A61P13/12, A61P9/00, A61P3/12, A61K33/24 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
A61K33/24 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,IL,US);
A61K38/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/16 (IL,US);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL);
A61P3/12 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P5/40 (EP,IL);
A61P7/12 (EP,IL);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL);
A61P9/04 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K33/24, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/49] | A61K33/24, A61P3/12, A61P5/40, A61P13/12, A61P9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2016/06] | A61K33/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROPORÖSES ZIRKONIUMSILIKAT UND DIURETIKA ZUR REDUKTION VON KALIUM UND BEHANDLUNG CHRONISCHER NIEREN- UND/ODER CHRONISCHER HERZERKRANKUNGEN | [2016/06] | English: | MICROPOROUS ZIRCONIUM SILICATE AND DIURETICS FOR THE REDUCTION OF POTASSIUM AND TREATMENT OF CHRONIC KIDNEY AND/OR CHRONIC HEART DISEASE | [2016/06] | French: | SILICATE DE ZIRCONIUM MICROPOREUX ET AGENTS DIURÉTIQUES POUR LA RÉDUCTION DU POTASSIUM ET LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE RÉNALE CHRONIQUE ET/OU CARDIAQUE CHRONIQUE | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 26.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2023
23.11.2023
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. Tel Aviv 6944020 / IL Opponent's representative Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | 02
01.12.2023
04.12.2023
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Building 4, Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2023
23.11.2023
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. Tel Aviv 6944020 / IL Opponent's representative Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
02
01.12.2023
04.12.2023
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Building 4, Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | |||
Former [2024/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2023
23.11.2023
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. Tel Aviv 6944020 / IL Opponent's representative Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | ||
02
01.12.2023
04.12.2023
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Building 4, Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | |||
Former [2023/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2023
23.11.2023
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. Tel Aviv 6944020 / IL Opponent's representative Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | 13.12.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.04.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.2025 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.03.2025 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | LU | 03.04.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/11] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.04.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.04.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.04.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | HR | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HR | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 01.03.2023 | |
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 01.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02062356 (ASH MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al); | [A]US6579460 (WILLIS RICHARD R [US], et al); | [A]WO2012109590 (ZS PHARMA INC [US], et al); | [PX]WO2014011876 (ZS PHARMA INC [US], et al); | [E]WO2014066407 (ZS PHARMA INC [US]) | International search | [Y]US5891417 (BEM DAVID S [US], et al); | [Y]US6159505 (PIPER EDWINA M [GB]); | [Y]US2004105895 (ASH STEPHEN R [US]); | [Y]US2010104527 (MANSKY PAUL [US], et al); | [X]US2012213847 (KEYSER DONALD JEFFREY [US], et al) | Examination | US2014113002 | Opposition | US6332985 | WO02062356 | WO2012109590 | WO2014011876 | US5891417 |