EP3006455 - FRAGMENT FC D'IGG4 COMPRENANT UNE RÉGION CHARNIÈRE MODIFIÉE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanmi Pharm. Co., Ltd. 214 Muha-ro Paltan-myeon Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-958 / KR | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Sung Youb 550, Dongtangiheung-ro Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18469 / KR | 02 /
HUH, Yong Ho 109-204 102 Sadang-ro 2ga-gil Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-744 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Sung Hee 603-1804 209 Pangyowon-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-959 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Jong Soo 310-1601 72 Jeongjail-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-725 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, In Young 105-1801 70 Yonggu-daero2771beon-gil Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-755 / KR | [2016/23] |
Former [2016/15] | 01 /
JUNG, Sung Youb 109-105 373 Gwongwang-ro Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-754 / KR | ||
02 /
HUH, Yong Ho 109-204 102 Sadang-ro 2ga-gil Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-744 / KR | |||
03 /
PARK, Sung Hee 603-1804 209 Pangyowon-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-959 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Jong Soo 310-1601 72 Jeongjail-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-725 / KR | |||
05 /
CHOI, In Young 105-1801 70 Yonggu-daero2771beon-gil Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-755 / KR | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Andrews, Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 14804503.2 | 29.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014KR04799 | Priority number, date | KR20130063029 | 31.05.2013 Original published format: KR 20130063029 | [2016/15] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014193173 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006455 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3006455 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, C12N15/13, C12N15/63, A61K47/42 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A61K38/193 (EP,US);
C07K7/08 (KR);
A61K47/42 (KR);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61K47/68 (EP,US);
A61K47/6813 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K16/2803 (US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12N15/63 (KR);
C07K2317/40 (US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
C07K2317/53 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IGG4-FC-FRAGMENT MIT MODIFIZIERTEM SCHARNIERBEREICH | [2016/15] | English: | IGG4 FC FRAGMENT COMPRISING MODIFIED HINGE REGION | [2016/15] | French: | FRAGMENT FC D'IGG4 COMPRENANT UNE RÉGION CHARNIÈRE MODIFIÉE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2015 | Translation filed | 18.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 26.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18168489.5 / EP3406627 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | MT | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
MT | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | RS | 04.07.2018 | |
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | IS | 04.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008082274 (HANMI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document * | International search | [X]WO2005047334 (HANMI PHARM IND CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]US7968316 (JUNG SUNG YOUB [KR], et al); | [A]US2012100140 (REYES CHRISTOPHER L [US], et al); | [A]WO2012083370 (CEPHALON AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]US2012276097 (YANG SEHWAN [KR], et al) | by applicant | US5349053 | WO9632478 | US5585097 | WO9734631 | - COLE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 159, pages 3613 - 3621 | - VAN DER NEUT KOLFSCHOTEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 317, pages 1554 - 1557 |