EP3043827 - MODULATORS OF COMPLEMENT FACTOR B [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ionis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSMAN, Tamar R. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 02 /
MCCALEB, Michael L. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 03 /
WATT, Andrew T. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 04 /
FREIER, Susan M. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/29] | Application number, filing date | 14844168.6 | 12.09.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014US55458 | Priority number, date | US201361877624P | 13.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361877624 P | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015038939 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3043827 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3043827 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12N15/113 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
C12N15/1137 (EP,EA,RU,US);
A61P13/00 (EP,EA);
A61P13/12 (EP,EA);
A61P27/02 (EP,EA);
A61P43/00 (EP,EA);
C12Y304/21047 (EP,EA,RU,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,EA,US);
C12N2310/315 (EA,US);
C12N2310/321 (EA,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/29] | A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Extension states | BA | 12.04.2016 | ME | 12.04.2016 | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN DES KOMPLEMENTFAKTORS B | [2016/29] | English: | MODULATORS OF COMPLEMENT FACTOR B | [2016/29] | French: | MODULATEURS DU FACTEUR B DU COMPLÉMENT | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 22.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.11.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19182415.0 / EP3603677 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.07.2019 | CY | 03.07.2019 | EE | 03.07.2019 | LV | 03.07.2019 | MC | 03.07.2019 | MK | 03.07.2019 | MT | 03.07.2019 | SM | 03.07.2019 | LU | 12.09.2019 | IS | 03.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
MT | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
LU | 12.09.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
LU | 12.09.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
LU | 12.09.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
LU | 12.09.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | LV | 03.07.2019 | |
IS | 03.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2004103288 (NEW YORK SOC FOR THE RUPTURED [US], et al) | International search | [X]US2005107319 (BANSAL REKHA [US]); | [X]WO2008036841 (DHARMACON INC [US], et al); | [A]US2008085869 (YAMADA CHRISTINA [US], et al); | [X]US2010120665 (KALEKO MICHAEL [US], et al); | by applicant | US4981957 | US5118800 | US5319080 | US5359044 | US5393878 | US5446137 | US5466786 | US5514785 | US5519134 | US5567811 | US5576427 | US5591722 | US5597909 | US5610300 | US5627053 | US5639873 | US5646265 | US5670633 | US5700920 | US5792847 | WO0063364 | WO0149687 | US6600032 | US6673661 | WO2004103288 | WO2005121371 | WO2006047842 | US20020399998 | WO2003US33466 |