blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2905030

EP2905030 - Human antibodies that bind lymphocyte activation gene-3 (LAG-3) and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2024Change: Date of oral proceedings 
15.04.2024Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. R. Squibb & Sons, L.L.C.
Route 206 & Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
[2015/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Thudium, Kent B.
700 Bay Road
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
02 / Korman, Alan J.
700 Bay Road
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
03 / Leblanc, Heidi
700 Bay Road
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
04 / Yamanaka, Mark
2953 Amoroso Court
Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US
05 / Selby, Mark
700 Bay Road
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
06 / Zens, Kyra, D.
521 Cottonwood Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
 [2015/36]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/33]Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date15156647.811.08.2009
[2015/33]
Priority number, dateUS20080188548P11.08.2008         Original published format: US 188548 P
[2015/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2905030
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2905030
Date:06.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2015
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/00, C07K17/00, A61K39/395, A61K51/10, C07K16/28
[2015/33]
CPC:
C07K16/2803 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US); A61P31/12 (EP,IL); A61P31/18 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR); A61P35/02 (EP,IL); A61P37/00 (EP,IL);
A61P37/04 (EP,IL); A61P43/00 (EP,IL); C07K16/2827 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US); A61K2039/507 (EP,IL,US); C07K2317/21 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (KR); C07K2317/34 (EP,IL,US); C07K2317/73 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,KR,US); C07K2317/92 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Former [2015/33]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Lymphozytenaktivierungsgen-3 (LAG-3) bindende humane Antikörper und ihre Verwendung[2015/33]
English:Human antibodies that bind lymphocyte activation gene-3 (LAG-3) and uses thereof[2015/33]
French:Anticorps humains qui se lient à l'activation des lymphocytes gène-3 (lag-3) et leurs utilisations[2015/33]
Examination procedure09.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/11]
13.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2019Fee for grant paid
26.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09807162.4  / EP2320940
Divisional application(s)EP19186310.9  / EP3597216
EP22185991.1  / EP4147714
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.08.2020  18.08.2020  ADMISSIBLE
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2020/39]
25.08.2020Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.03.2021Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.09.2022Date of oral proceedings
04.10.2022Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.10.2022Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition02.12.2022Appeal received No.  T2552/22
02.12.2022Payment of appeal fee
14.02.2023Statement of grounds filed
09.12.2022Appeal received No.  T2552/22
09.12.2022Payment of appeal fee
13.02.2023Statement of grounds filed
13.05.2025Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO9110682  (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al);
 [XYI]WO9530750  (ROUSSY INST GUSTAVE [FR], et al);
 [XYI]WO9703695  (APPLIED RESEARCH SYSTEMS [AN], et al);
 [XYI]US6197524  (ROMAGNANI SERGIO [IT]);
by applicantUS4399216
 US4439196
 US4447233
 US4447224
 US4475196
 US4486194
 US4487603
 US4522811
 EP0154316
 US4596556
 US4634665
 WO8704462
 US4790824
 WO8901036
 US4816567
 EP0338841
 US4941880
 EP0401384
 US5064413
 WO9203918
 US5179017
 WO9312227
 US5223409
 US5225539
 US5312335
 WO9425585
 US5374548
 WO9429351
 US5383851
 US5399163
 US5399331
 US5403484
 US5416016
 US5427908
 US5476996
 US5530101
 US5545806
 US5545807
 US5569825
 US5571698
 US5580717
 US5585089
 WO9713852
 US5624821
 US5625126
 US5633425
 US5648260
 US5661016
 US5677425
 US5693762
 US5698767
 US5714350
 US5760185
 US5762905
 WO9824884
 US5770429
 US5789650
 US5811097
 US5814318
 WO9842752
 US5833943
 US5837243
 US5869046
 US5874299
 US5877397
 US5885793
 US5922845
 US5939598
 WO9945962
 US5969108
 WO9954342
 US6075181
 WO0037504
 US6090382
 WO0042072
 US6114598
 US6121022
 US6150584
 US6156313
 US6162963
 US6165745
 US6172197
 US6180370
 WO0109187
 US6194551
 WO0114424
 US6207156
 US6277375
 EP1176195
 US6350861
 WO0243478
 WO02092780
 WO02092812
 WO02096910
 US2002199213
 US6521404
 US6544731
 US6555313
 WO03035835
 US6582915
 US6593081
 US2003153043
 WO03074679
 US2004110704
 US6794132
 US6818216
 US6827925
 US6914128
 US2005153394
 US6951646
 US2006004081
 US6989452
 US2006024317
 US7087600
 WO2006089231
 US7129261
 US2006247295
 WO2006121168
 WO2007005874
 WO2007038658
 WO2007051081
 WO2007059404
 WO2008083312
 WO2008103693
 WO2009045957
 WO2009054863
 WO2009073533
 WO2009073546
OppositionWO9530750
 EP0758383
 US5874250
 US5976877
 US6197524
 WO0243478
 US6808710
 US2006083744
 WO2006121168
 WO2010019570
 US10358495
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.