blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2949670

EP2949670 - ANTIBODIES BINDING PREFERENTIALLY HUMAN CSF1R EXTRACELLULAR DOMAIN 4 AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 03.08.2022  [2022/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2015/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Dimoudis, Nikolaos
Laberstrasse 9
82407 Wielenbach / DE
02 / Kaluza, Klaus
Tankenrain 3
82362 Weilheim / DE
03 / Seeber, Stefan
Mitterweg 2
82404 Sindelsdorf / DE
04 / Fertig, Georg
St.-Klara-Strasse 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
05 / Lanzendoerfer, Martin
deceased / DE
06 / Ries, Carola
St.-Klara-Strasse 9
82377 Penzberg / DE
07 / Thomas, Marlene
Amselsteig 12
79618 Rheinfelden / DE
08 / Fidler, Alexander
Barbarastrasse 10
82377 Penzberg / DE
 [2015/49]
Representative(s)Burger, Alexander, et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Patentabteilung
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/49]Burger, Alexander, et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52
82372 Penzberg / DE
Application number, filing date15168902.307.12.2010
[2015/49]
Priority number, dateEP2009001531010.12.2009         Original published format: EP 09015310
EP2010017340719.08.2010         Original published format: EP 10173407
[2015/49]
Previously filed application, dateWO2010EP6909007.12.2010
[2015/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2949670
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2949670
Date:27.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2015
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/28, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61K39/00
[2015/49]
CPC:
C07K16/2866 (EP,US); C07K16/28 (KR); A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P19/08 (EP); A61P19/10 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP); A61P35/04 (EP); A61P37/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US); C07K2317/21 (US); C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (US); C07K2317/56 (EP,US); C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/567 (EP,US); C07K2317/622 (US); C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US); C07K2317/92 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/28]
Former [2015/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORZUGSWEISE AN DIE EXTRAZELLULÄRE DOMÄNE 4 VON HUMANEM CSF1R BINDENDE ANTIKÖRPER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2015/49]
English:ANTIBODIES BINDING PREFERENTIALLY HUMAN CSF1R EXTRACELLULAR DOMAIN 4 AND THEIR USE[2015/49]
French:ANTICORPS SE LIANT DE PRÉFÉRENCE AU DOMAINE EXTRACELLULAIRE 4 DU CSF1R HUMAIN ET LEUR UTILISATION[2015/49]
Examination procedure02.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/28]
04.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2018Fee for grant paid
14.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
18.07.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10794936.4  / EP2510010
Opposition(s)28.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
18.07.2018Request for further processing filed
18.07.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.07.2018Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
04.08.2016Request for further processing filed
04.08.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.08.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL27.02.2019
CY27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
MK27.02.2019
MT27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
IS27.06.2019
[2022/31]
Former [2021/34]AL27.02.2019
CY27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
MT27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
IS27.06.2019
Former [2021/26]AL27.02.2019
CY27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
IS27.06.2019
Former [2020/39]AL27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
IS27.06.2019
Former [2019/52]AL27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
IS27.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
IS27.06.2019
Former [2019/39]LV27.02.2019
IS27.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[ID]WO2009026303  (AMGEN INC [US], et al);
 [AD]WO2009112245  (TRANSGENE SA [FR], et al);
by applicantEP0307434
 US5202238
 US5204244
 WO0130381
 US2002141994
 WO2004045532
 WO2005046657
 WO2006096489
 WO2009026303
 WO2009112245
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.