EP2985032 - GLYX FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE, PARKINSON'S DISEASE OR HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/07] | GLYX FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE, AIDS DEMENTIA, PARKINSON'S DISEASE OR HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE | ||
[2018/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northwestern University 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOSKAL, Joseph 801 Central Street Evanston, IL Illinois 60201 / US | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/01] |
Former [2016/07] | Lau, Sarah Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15171991.1 | 05.10.2010 | [2016/07] | Priority number, date | US20090248650P | 05.10.2009 Original published format: US 248650 P | [2016/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2985032 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2985032 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/10, A61P25/22, A61P25/24 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
A61K38/07 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2016/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GLYX ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON ALZHEIMERKRANKHEIT, PARKINSONKRANKHEIT ODER HUNTINGTONKRANKHEIT | [2018/30] | English: | GLYX FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE, PARKINSON'S DISEASE OR HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE | [2018/30] | French: | GLYX POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER, LA MALADIE DE PARKINSON OU LA MALADIE DE HUNTINGTON | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/09] | GLYX ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON ALZHEIMERKRANKHEIT, AIDS DEMENTIA, PARKINSONKRANKHEIT ODER HUNTINGTONKRANKHEIT | ||
Former [2016/07] | GLYX FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE, AIDS DEMENTIA, PARKINSON'S DISEASE OR HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE | ||
Former [2016/07] | GLYX POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER, LA DEMENCE DU SIDA, LA MALADIE DE PARKINSON OU LA MALADIE DE HUNTINGTON | Examination procedure | 16.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 17.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10822514.5 / EP2485751 | EP14169137.8 / EP2813236 | Divisional application(s) | EP18248179.6 / EP3488856 | EP21159885.9 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 02.04.2021 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | RS | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | SM | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02072609 (NYXIS NEUROTHERAPIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * * example 4 * * page 20, line 25 - page 21, line 21 * * claims 20-27 *; | [XP] - CRANE A ET AL, "Reduction of cognitive deficits in the HD 51 CAG rat model of Huntington's disease with a NMDA receptor partial agonist, GLYX-13", ABSTRACTS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20111114), vol. 41, ISSN 0190-5295, XP009166597 [XP] 1-3 * the whole document * | [XP] - WOLFRAM-ADUAN A ET AL, "Globus pallidus neurochemical responses to the partial NMDA agonist GLYX-13 among HD51(CAG) Huntington's disease model rats", ABSTRACTS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20110101), vol. 41, ISSN 0190-5295, XP009166606 [XP] 1-3 * the whole document * | [Y] - STANTON PATRIC K ET AL, "Neuroprotection by a novel NMDAR functional glycine site partial agonist, GLYX-13", NEUROREPORT, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, UK, (20090801), vol. 20, no. 13, doi:10.1097/WNR.0B013E32832F5130, ISSN 0959-4965, pages 1193 - 1197, XP009166611 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * * Conclusion; page 1197 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/WNR.0b013e32832f5130 | [Y] - MOSKAL J R ET AL, "GLYX-13: A monoclonal antibody-derived peptide that acts as an N-methyl-d-aspartate receptor modulator", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 49, no. 7, ISSN 0028-3908, (20051201), pages 1077 - 1087, (20051201), XP027632781 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * * 3.6 In vivo learning studies; page 1082, column l - page 1084, column l * | [Y] - ZHANG X L ET AL, "A NMDA receptor glycine site partial agonist, GLYX-13, simultaneously enhances LTP and reduces LTD at Schaffer collateral-CA1 synapses in hippocampus", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 55, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.NEUROPHARM.2008.08.018, ISSN 0028-3908, (20081201), pages 1238 - 1250, (20080829), XP025585049 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuropharm.2008.08.018 | [T] - BURGDORF JEFFREY ET AL, "The N-methyl-D-aspartate receptor modulator GLYX-13 enhances learning and memory, in young adult and learning impaired aging rats", NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, USA, (20110401), vol. 32, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.NEUROBIOLAGING.2009.04.012, ISSN 1558-1497, pages 698 - 706, XP009166613 [T] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neurobiolaging.2009.04.012 | [Y] - KRYSTAL J H ET AL, "NMDA AGONISTS AND ANTAGONISTS AS PROBES OF GLUTAMATERGIC DYSFUNCTION AND PHARMACOTHERAPIES IN NEUROPSYCHIATRIC DISORDERS", HARVARD REVIEW OF PSYCHIATRY, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (19990101), vol. 7, no. 3, doi:10.1093/HRP/7.3.125, ISSN 1067-3229, pages 125 - 143, XP008048548 [Y] 1-3 * page 127; table 1 * * page 127, column r, paragraph 2 - page 129, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 131, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph l * * page 132; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hrp/7.3.125 | by applicant | US4086196 | US5763393 | US6107271 | - BLISS; COLLINGRIDGE, NATURE, (1993), vol. 361, pages 31 - 39 | - MUIR; LEES, STROKE, (1995), vol. 26, pages 503 - 513 | - MOTHET ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (2000), vol. 97, pages 4926 - 4931 | - KOZIKOWSKI ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 33, pages 1561 - 1571 | - RUSH ET AL., AM. J. PSYCHIATRY, (2006), vol. 163, page 1905 | - WOOD ET AL., NEUROREPORT, (2008), vol. 19, pages 1059 - 1061 | - LEESON; IVERSEN, J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, pages 4053 - 4067 | - BRISTOW ET AL., JPET, (1996), vol. 279, pages 492 - 501 | - PARSONS ET AL., JPET, (1997), vol. 283, pages 1264 - 1275 | - GARCIA ET AL., PROG NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOL BIOL PSYCHIATRY, (2008), vol. 32, pages 140 - 144 | - TREIT D; FUNDYTUS M, "Thigmotaxis as a test for anxiolytic activity in rats", PHARMACHOL BIOCHEM BEHAV, (1989), vol. 31, doi:doi:10.1016/0091-3057(88)90413-3, pages 959 - 62, XP025521052 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0091-3057(88)90413-3 | - BURGDORF, J.; PANKSEPP, J.; BRUDZYNSKI, S.M.; KROES, R.A.; MOSKAL, J.R., "The effect of selective breeding for differential rates of 50-kHz ultrasonic vocalizations on emotional behavior in rats", DEVEL. PSYCHOBIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 51, pages 34 - 46 |