blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3202814

EP3202814 - LOW BURST POLY-(LACTIDE/GLYCOLIDE) AND METHODS TO PRODUCE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.08.2020
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.09.2020  [2020/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tolmar Therapeutics, Inc.
701 Centre Avenue
Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US
[2017/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Dadey, Eric
3320 Lancashire Road
Furlong, PA Pennsylvania 18925 / US
02 / Middleton, John
756 Tom Martin Drive
Birmingham, AL Alabama 35211 / US
03 / Norton, Richard L.
199 Camino Real
Ft. Collins, CO Colorado 80524 / US
 [2017/32]
Representative(s)Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 40 09
40031 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/42]Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 40 09
40031 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2017/32]Leifert & Steffan
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09
40031 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date15185218.313.02.2008
[2017/32]
Priority number, dateUS20070901435P15.02.2007         Original published format: US 901435 P
[2017/32]
Previously filed application, dateWO2008US0188713.02.2008
[2017/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3202814
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3202814
Date:16.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2017
ClassificationIPC:C08G63/664, C08G63/90, C08G63/08, A61K9/00, A61K47/34, A61K38/12, A61K38/08
[2017/32]
CPC:
A61K9/0024 (EP,US); A61K47/34 (EP,US); A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61K38/12 (EP,US); A61P13/08 (EP); A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP); A61P15/18 (EP); A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP); A61P25/18 (EP); A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP); A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP); A61P31/12 (EP); A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP); A61P37/00 (EP); A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP); C08G63/08 (EP,US); C08G63/90 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/11]
Former [2017/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:POLY-(LACTID/GLYCOLID) MIT GERINGEN BURST-EIGENSCHAFTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYMEREN[2017/32]
English:LOW BURST POLY-(LACTIDE/GLYCOLIDE) AND METHODS TO PRODUCE POLYMERS[2017/32]
French:POLY-(LACTIDE/GLYCOLIDE) FAIBLE SALVE ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PRODUIRE DES POLYMÈRES[2017/32]
Examination procedure15.09.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.05.2016Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
15.07.2016Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
05.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/11]
10.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2019Fee for grant paid
04.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08725511.3  / EP2115029
Divisional application(s)EP19203071.6  / EP3660073
Opposition(s)17.07.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
15.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
15.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
15.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9918142  (MACROMED INC [US]) [A] 1-16* example -; claim - *;
 [A]US2003153724  (YAMAMOTO KOHEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]JP2004256546  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1-16 * example - *
by applicantUS4728721
 US4810775
 US5278202
 US5278201
 US5324519
 US5340849
 US5487897
 US5585460
 US5599552
 US5681873
 US5702716
 US5733950
 US5736152
 US5739176
 US5744153
 US5759563
 US5780044
 US5792469
 US5945115
 US5990194
 US6143314
 US6261583
 US6355657
 US6395293
 US6461631
 USRE37950E
 US6528080
 US6565874
 US7019106
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.