EP3094392 - METHOD FOR REDUCING THE BIOBURDEN OF A CHROMATOGRAPHY RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2025 Database last updated on 01.05.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genzyme Corporation 50 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
[2018/29] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODAWAT, Rahul c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code: 55A-505A Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | ||
02 /
WARIKOO, Veena c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code: 55A-505A Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | |||
03 /
PATIL, Rohan c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code: 55A-505A Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | |||
04 /
KONSTANTINOV, Konstantin c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code: 55A-505A Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | |||
05 /
RYAKALA, Venkat Kishore c/o Sanofi 55 Corporate Drive Mail Code: 55A-505A Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | |||
[2016/47] | |||
Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | ||
[2024/17] | |||
Application number, filing date | 15702074.4 | 16.01.2015 | |
[2016/47] | |||
WO2015US11705 | |||
Priority number, date | US201461928929P | 17.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461928929 P | |
US201462001498P | 21.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462001498 P | ||
[2016/47] | |||
Filing language | EN | ||
Procedural language | EN | ||
Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | |
No.: | WO2015109151 | ||
Date: | 23.07.2015 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2015/29] | |||
Type: | A1 Application with search report | ||
No.: | EP3094392 | ||
Date: | 23.11.2016 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | |||
[2016/47] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP3094392 | ||
Date: | 24.04.2024 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2024/17] | |||
Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2015 |
Classification | IPC: | B01D15/20, B01D15/36, B01D15/18, B01D15/34, B01D15/38, B01J20/281, A61L2/08, B01J20/26, B01J39/26, B01J41/12, B01J41/20, B01D15/32, B01J20/34 | [2023/48] |
CPC: |
B01J20/3441 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61L2/08 (IL,RU);
B01D15/1864 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| ||
Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | ||
Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | |
ME | Not yet paid | ||
Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER BIOBELASTUNG EINES CHROMATOGRAPHIEHARZES | [2023/48] |
English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING THE BIOBURDEN OF A CHROMATOGRAPHY RESIN | [2023/48] | |
French: | MÉTHODE DE RÉDUCTION DE LA CHARGE MICROBIENNE D'UNE RÉSINE DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE | [2023/48] | |
Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | |
17.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | ||
17.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | ||
Examination procedure | 17.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | |
17.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | ||
18.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | ||
18.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | ||
27.04.2021 | Observations by third parties | ||
05.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | ||
04.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | ||
24.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | ||
23.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | ||
20.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
19.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | ||
19.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
19.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | ||
Opposition(s) | 27.01.2025 | No opposition filed within time limit [2025/14] | |
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | ||
14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | ||
13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | ||
16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | ||
14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | ||
14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 24.04.2024 | |
CZ | 24.04.2024 | ||
EE | 24.04.2024 | ||
FI | 24.04.2024 | ||
HR | 24.04.2024 | ||
LV | 24.04.2024 | ||
SI | 24.04.2024 | ||
SK | 24.04.2024 | ||
SM | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.07.2024 | ||
GR | 25.07.2024 | ||
IS | 24.08.2024 | ||
PT | 26.08.2024 | ||
[2025/22] | |||
Cited in | International search | [XA]RU2034853 ; | |
[XAYI]WO03045546 (PROMETIC BIOSCIENCES LTD [GB], et al); | |||
[XY]US2007244307 (ENGSTRAND CARINA [SE], et al); | |||
[XY]US2012255642 (GEBAUER KLAUS [SE]); | |||
[A]US2013068671 (GEBAUER KLAUS [SE], et al); | |||
[Y]EP2682168 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]); | |||
by applicant | US2012164066 |