EP3114118 - P-SUBSTITUTED ASYMMETRIC UREAS AND MEDICAL USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helsinn Healthcare SA Via Pian Scairolo 9 6912 Lugano-Pazzallo / CH | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIULIANO, Claudio Via Prudenziana 28/A 22100 Como / IT | 02 /
GARCIA RUBIO, Silvina 7 Bellflower Ct. Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 03 /
DAINA, Antoine Quartier Sorge Batiment Genopode 1015 Lausanne / CH | 04 /
GUAINAZZI, Angelo 170 Wood Avenue South 5th Floor Iselin, NJ 08830 / US | 05 /
PIETRA, Claudio Via Scalabrini No. 56 22100 Como / IT | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [2017/02] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 15711614.6 | 06.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015US19112 | Priority number, date | US201461949664P | 07.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461949664 P | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015134839 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3114118 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3114118 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D239/26, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D409/14, C07D413/12, C07D241/12, C07D417/12, C07D417/14, C07D471/04, C07D401/06, C07D401/12, C07D211/58, C07D211/60, C07D211/94, C07D211/96, C07D213/00 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
A61P1/00 (EP);
C07D211/58 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,EA,US);
C07F7/0812 (EA,US);
A61K31/17 (KR);
A61K31/4453 (KR);
A61K31/497 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D211/60 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D211/94 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D211/96 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D213/00 (EP,EA,US);
C07D239/26 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D241/12 (EP,EA,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,EA,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,EA,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,EA,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,EA,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,EA,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/02] | C07D401/06, C07C275/06, C07C275/26, C07D401/12, C07D211/58, C07D211/60, C07D211/94, C07D211/96, C07D213/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Extension states | BA | 26.08.2016 | ME | 26.08.2016 | Validation states | MA | 26.08.2016 | Title | German: | P-SUBSTITUIERTE ASYMMETRISCHE HARNSTOFFE UND MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/02] | English: | P-SUBSTITUTED ASYMMETRIC UREAS AND MEDICAL USES THEREOF | [2017/02] | French: | URÉES ASYMÉTRIQUES P-SUBSTITUÉES ET UTILISATIONS MÉDICALES DE CELLES-CI | [2017/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 21.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | MK | 22.07.2020 | MT | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | RS | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MK | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | LT | 22.07.2020 | |
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 22.07.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6399619 (BERK SCOTT [US], et al); | [X]WO2004064738 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2006014136 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [X]US2008227780 (GLESS RICHARD D [US], et al); | [X]WO2009039461 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2011060397 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO2012113103 (HELSINN HEALTHCARE SA [CH], et al); |