blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3169328

EP3169328 - QUINOLINE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2023
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.02.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.10.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.09.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.05.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  31.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2023No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.02.2023  [2023/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABIVAX
5 rue de la Baume
75008 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
Institut Curie
26, rue d'Ulm
75248 Paris Cedex 05 / FR
For all designated states
Université de Montpellier
163 Rue Auguste Broussonnet
34090 Montpellier / FR
[2017/21]
Inventor(s)01 / TAZI, Jamal
4 rue Condorcet
F-34380 Clapiers / FR
02 / NAJMAN, Romain
29b rue du 11 Novembre 1918
F-94240 L'Hay-les-Roses / FR
03 / MAHUTEAU, Florence
36 avenue Hoche
F-78470 Saint Remy Les Chevreuses / FR
04 / SCHERRER, Didier
18 avenue de la Fée Mélusine
F-34170 Castelnau Le Lez / FR
05 / HAHNE, Michael
33, rue Lakanal
F-34090 Montpellier / FR
06 / CHEBLI, Karim
20, rue Boucarié
F-34110 Frontignan / FR
 [2017/21]
Representative(s)Cabinet Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/21]Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date15738916.417.07.2015
[2017/21]
WO2015EP66458
Priority number, dateEP2014030616417.07.2014         Original published format: EP 14306164
[2017/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2016009065
Date:21.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3169328
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2017/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3169328
Date:09.03.2022
Language:EN
[2022/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.03.2016
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/47, A61K31/4709, A61K31/497, A61K31/5377, G01N33/50, C07D401/12, C07D215/38, C12Q1/6883, A61P1/04, A61P1/00, A61P9/10, // A61P11/00, A61P11/06, A61P17/00, A61P17/06, A61P19/02, A61P21/00, A61P25/00, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/06
[2021/21]
CPC:
C07D215/38 (EP,CN,RU,US); A61K31/47 (EP,KR,RU,US); C12Q1/6883 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,CN,RU,US); A61K31/4709 (EP,KR,RU,US); A61K31/496 (RU);
A61K31/497 (EP,RU,US); A61K31/5377 (EP,RU,US); A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP,RU); A61P11/00 (EP); A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP,RU); A61P17/06 (EP); A61P19/02 (EP,RU);
A61P21/00 (EP); A61P25/00 (EP,RU); A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP,KR,RU); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP,RU); A61P9/10 (EP); C07D401/14 (RU);
C07D413/12 (RU); C07D413/14 (RU); C07F9/60 (CN);
C07F9/65583 (CN); C12Q1/6874 (KR); G01N33/5023 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/5055 (EP,CN,US); C12Q2600/136 (EP,CN,KR,US); C12Q2600/158 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,CN,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/21]A61K31/47, A61K31/4709, A61K31/497, A61K31/5377, C07D215/38, A61P29/00, A61P1/00, A61P19/02, A61P25/00, G01N33/50, C12Q1/68
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHINOLINDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNGSKRANKHEITEN[2017/21]
English:QUINOLINE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASES[2017/21]
French:QUINOLINE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASES[2021/21]
Former [2017/21]DÉRIVÉS DE QUINOLÉINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES INFLAMMATOIRES
Entry into regional phase17.02.2017National basic fee paid 
17.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/21]
04.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2021Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.10.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2022Fee for grant paid
27.01.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.01.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP21211115.7  / EP3998070
Opposition(s)12.12.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2023/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
02.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSM09.03.2022
[2023/02]
Former [2022/49]SK09.03.2022
SM09.03.2022
Former [2022/47]SM09.03.2022
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS5272821  (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO);
 [I]WO2004007461  (PRANA BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD [AU], et al);
 [I]WO2007103162  (SAMARITAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al);
 [X]US2009227628  (KOLCZEWSKI SABINE [DE], et al);
 [A]WO2010127208  (FOREST LAB HOLDINGS LTD, et al);
 [X]WO2010143168  (SPLICOS SOC [FR], et al);
 [X]EP2465502  (SPLICOS SOC [FR], et al);
 [I]US2012202870  (WEINER HOWARD [US], et al);
 [XP]WO2014111892  (SPLICOS [FR], et al);
 [XP]WO2015001518  (SPLICOS [FR], et al);
ExaminationWO2015131019
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.